West Coast Vegetable Co., Inc. v. West Central Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: West Coast Vegetable Co., Inc.
Defendant: West Central Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv03096
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER 38 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/6/11; This case is demissed with prejudice. The Clerk sall close the file. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/5/2011 ORDERING that the Jury Trial be RESET for 9/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/04/10 ORDERING Discovery due by 4/18/2011, A joint pretrial statement shall be filed by July 8, 2011; Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 7/15/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Ju dge John A. Mendez, Jury Trial re-set for 8/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Except as otherwise set forth herein, the parties request that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order remain in effect as filed March 8, 2010. (Williams, D)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/16/2010 21 ORDERING that the 20 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is MODIFIED as follows: Discovery ddl 1/11/2011 ; Designation of Expert Witnesses ddl 11/10/2010 ; Dispositive Motions Hearing ddl 2/23/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Duong, D)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 07-30-10. Discovery due by 11/30/2010; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/15/2010; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/15/2010; Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM ) before Judge John A. Mendez. Parties shall file their Joint Pre-Trial Conference Statement not later than 02/16/11; Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 2/23/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; Jury Trial re-set for 4/4/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Williams, D)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/10. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER 13 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/5/10 ORDERING that the Jury Trial is reset for 3/28/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Vegetable Co., Inc. v. West Central Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Vegetable Co., Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Central Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?