Reyes, et al., v. Modesto, et al.,
Plaintiff: Victoria Reyes and Jose Reyes
Defendant: Joseph Modesto, David Jakabosky, Michelle Davis-Tate, Richard Winters and Nancy Meuer
Case Number: 2:2009cv03114
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/12/2013 ORDERING 40 On 9/5/2013, plaintiff Victoria Reyes filed a change of address, coupled with a request to reopen her case. As the docket reflects plaintiffs' continued failure to comply with the court's orders and to prosecute the case, the court DECLINES to reopen. NO FURTHER ORDERS WILL ISSUE in this closed case. (Reader, L)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/6/12 Recommending that that Plaintiffs' complaint be dismissed with prejudicere 1 , 14 . These FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are referred to U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/01/12 ORDERING that no later than 06/22/12, plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why their case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failing to prosecute this action and comply with the Court's order. Plaintiffs' failure to file the required writing shall constitute additional grounds for, and plaintiffs' consent to, the dismissal of their case with prejudice. (Benson, A.)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/26/12 ADOPTING 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING 33 Motion to Reopen Case; DENYING AS MOOT 34 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiffs may either attempt to effectuate service of their First Amen ded Complaint through the U.S. Marshals office or file a second amended complaint, which will be subject to screening. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiffs must file a notice with the court indicating whether they intend to effectuate service of their First Amended Complaint through the U.S. Marshals office or file a second amended complaint. Thereafter, the magistrate judge will enter a separate order addressing the timing and other requirements addressed to the option selected by plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall administratively CLOSE the action entitled Reyes v. West Sacramento Police, et al., No. 2:12-cv-00004 KJM KJN PS. (Meuleman, A)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/12; Plaintiffs motion to reopen this case (Dkt. No. 33) be granted and that this case be reopened. Plaintiffs be given an option to either attempt to effectuate servic e of their First Amended Complaint through the U.S. Marshals office or file a Second Amended Complaint, which would be subject to screening. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 34) be denied as moot. The Clerk of Cou rt be directed to administratively close the action entitled Reyes v. West Sacramento Police, et al., No. 2:12-cv-00004 KJM KJN PS (E.D. Cal). These findings and recommendations are submitted to the United States District Judge assigned to the case, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) (1). Within fourteen days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Id.; see also E. Dist. Local Rule 304(b). Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." Any response to the objections shall be filed with the court and served on all parties within fourteen days after service of the objections. E. Dist. Local Rule 304(d). Failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal the District Court's order. Turner v. Duncan, 158 F.3d 449, 455 (9th Cir. 1998); Martinez v. Ylst, 951 F.2d 1153, 1156-57 (9th Cir. 1991). IT IS SO RECOMMENDED.(Matson, R)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/17/11 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/11 ORDERING pltf's request for an extension of time 27 is GRANTED; pltf shall have 30 days from the date of this order to submit completed USM-285 forms and other previously identified documents to the US Marshal to effectuate service; the Status Conference is RE-SET for 6/16/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Carlos, K)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/7/10 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall have 60 days from the date of this order to submit completed USM-285 forms and other previously identified documents to the US Marshal in order to effectuate service of plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit to plaintiff Jose Reyes five USM-285 forms; all remaining requirements of the court's service order 16 remain in effect. (Becknal, R)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/8/10, ORDERING that 19 pltfs' request for assistance in obtaining information required to effectuate service on the named dfts is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to return the incomplete USM-285 forms to pltfs.(Kastilahn, A)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/29/10: Plaintiffs' application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot 15 . Service of plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is appropriate for the following five defendants: Jos eph Modesto, David Jakobosky, Michelle Davis- Tate, Richard Winters, and Nancy Meuer. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith all process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. The Clerk of Court shall send plaintiffs five USM-2 85 forms, one summons, an endorsed copy of the First Amended Complaint filed September 22, 2010 14 , this courts scheduling order, and the forms providing notice of the magistrate judge's availability to exercise jurisdiction for all purposes. (Kaminski, H)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/10 ORDERING Plaintiffs' 12 request for leave to file an Amended Complaint is GRANTED; plaintiffs shall have 60 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint, as described in this court's order entered 4/22/10 10 . (Becknal, R)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/22/2010 ORDERING that Pltfs' 7 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Pltfs' complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Pltf is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Engbretson, K.)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/2/10 ORDERING that within 20 days from the date of this order pltf Victoria Reyes shall submit either a completed IFP application or pay the appropriate filing fee; clerk directed to send new IFP application. (
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes, et al., v. Modesto, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jakabosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Davis-Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Meuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?