Jones v. Burgett et al
Plaintiff: Malik Jones
Defendant: J. Burgett, K. Harper, R. Blanthorn, E. Anderson, Ross, Starks, Speers and K. Wilcox
Case Number: 2:2009cv03218
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/06/10 vacating 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This action is dismissed on plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. The clerk of the court is directed to close this file. (Plummer, M)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/04/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/21/10 DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to randomly assign a DJ. Case is assigned to District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. New case number is 2:09-cv-3218 LKK CMK. (Williams, D)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/4/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Burgett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Blanthorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?