Wright v. Hedgeph
Petitioner: Dundell Wright
Respondent: A Hedgeph
Case Number: 2:2009cv03347
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/19/12 denying 50 Motion to Proceed IFP and denying 47 Motion for Extension of time to file a motion for certificate of appealability. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (cc: USCA-9th circuit) (Plummer, M)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/9/12 RECOMMENDING that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/20/11. The clerk of the court shall terminate docket entry #33. (Plummer, M)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/5/11 GRANTING 30 Motion to Seal. Pursuant to Local Rule 141, counsel to email the approved sealed documents to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov. (Donati, J)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/13/2011 ORDERING that, w/in 14 days, respondent shall lodge w/ this court the state court records pertaining to ptnr's Marsden claim.(Yin, K)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/22/2011 DENYING, w/out prejudice, ptnr's 25 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/20/2010 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition w/ 60 days; reply due w/in 30 days of answer; if response is a motion, opposition or statement of non-opposition due w/in 30 days of motion, reply due w/in 15 days thereafter; the clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(cc: Michael Farrell)(Yin, K)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/7/09 ORDERING that petitioner has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or an ifp application, petitioner's failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; the clerk to send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Hedgeph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dundell Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Hedgeph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?