(PC Marconnett v. Sacramento County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Scott Marconnett
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff Department and Sacramento County Sherrif Dept. Medical Staff
Case Number: 2:2009cv03369
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/2012 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; the Court shall retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/31/2012 GRANTING defendants' request and dispositional documents shall be filed not later than 11/16/2012. (Yin, K)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/26/12 ORDERING that the Request for Extension of time is GRANTED and dispositional documents shall be filed not later than 10/31/2012. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER regarding SETTLEMENT and DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/30/12 ordering the court has determined that this case has settled. The court now orders that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 09/27/12. All hearing dates set in this matter are vacated. (Plummer, M)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/09/12 ordering the custodian to produce Vincent Scott Marconnett at 08/30/12 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/17/12. (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2012 ADOPTING 37 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 29 Motion to Dismiss. (Donati, J)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/21/12 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge or if they wish to wish to be referred to the courts mediation program. Clerk of the Court is directed to send each party the consent form for settlement conferences.(Dillon, M)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/23/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 29 motion to dismiss be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/12/2011 DENYING pltf's 33 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/18/2011 ORDERING that, w/in 21 days, pltf to file either an oppositition or statement of non-opposition to the 29 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 11/23/10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 23 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/30/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Vincent Scott Marconnett to the clerk until the balance of $ ;350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER vacating the 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/23/10. Pltf has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust acct statement and a completed affidavit. The Clerk is directed to send pltf a new application form to proceed ifp by a prisoner. (Kastilahn, A)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/04/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/23/09 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust acct statement and a completed affidavit. The Clerk is directed to send pltf a prisoner ifp appl form. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC Marconnett v. Sacramento County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Scott Marconnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sherrif Dept. Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?