Hebert-Torres v. Oroville Hospital
Plaintiff: Laura Hebert-Torres
Defendant: Oroville Hospital, David Hall, Doug Edgar, Mark T. Heinrich, Steven A. Greenberg, Ardauan Afrasiabi, Dominique Engel, North State Imaging, Craig Letmer, Del Norte Clinics, Inc. and Molly Amick
Case Number: 2:2009cv03495
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/2012 ORDERING 57 Pursuant to the terms of the parties' stipulation to a compromise settlement and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT any and all claims against the United States of America are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Reader, L)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/21/12 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED from 8/29/2012 to 8/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Kastilahn, A)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/03/12 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 08/29/12 at 01:30 PM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Benson, A.)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/11 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE 1 Second Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/17/2011 WITH CASE 2:11-CV-1048 KJM CMK, and joined for all purposes. Furthermore, the court ORDERS that from the time of this order through the conclusion of this case, the appropriate case number for the consolidated action shall be 2:09-CV-3495 KJM-CMK for all purposes, and shall be used from this point forward. (Reader, L)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/11 ORDERING Discovery due by 4/20/2012; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 5/17/2012; all dispositive motions shall be heard by 11/14/2012; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Jury Trial set for 3/11/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Carlos, K)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER 31 signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/25/2011. Action 11-CV-1048 MCE GGH is REASSIGNED to Judge Mueller and Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Henceforth, caption on future documents shall be shown as 2:11-CV-1048 KJM CMK and Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment to compensate. (Marciel, M)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/11 ORDERING Plaintiff to refile her complaint against the United States in a new action and pay the civil filing fee within thirty days of the filing of this order. Defendants will have twenty-one days from being served the complaint to file an answer. The Clerk is instructed to STRIKE the complaint filed at docket number 24 from the docket. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/18/11 ORDERING 17 Motion to Dismiss is granted; Defendants United States of America, Del Norte Clinics, Inc., and Molly Amick are dismissed without prejudice.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert-Torres v. Oroville Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hebert-Torres
Represented By: Steven H. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oroville Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardauan Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North State Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Letmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Norte Clinics, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Pickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Amick
Represented By: Todd A. Pickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?