Berry v. Salinas, et al.,

Plaintiff: Stephen Berry
Defendant: S M Salinas, Ron Rackley, Charles Bennett, M. Chavez, D Haskell, V. Buffa and Richard Russell
Case Number: 2:2010cv00051
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/7/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim; 16 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Dillon, M)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/8/10 ORDERING that the complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days leave to amend. (Dillon, M)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/30/10 VACATING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff shall, within 30 days, file an amended complaint in accordance with the courts 6/23/10 order.(Dillon, M)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/10/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/23/2010 GRANTING plaintiff's 9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay filing fee and all payments shall be collected in accordance with Notice to Director of CDC. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend w/in 30 days. (Marciel, M)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/02/10 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/14/10 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit either the filing fee or the in forma pauperis application. Clerk to send plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Salinas, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S M Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Buffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?