Blair v. Lopeteguy et al
Plaintiff: James Blair
Defendant: Zachary Lopeteguy, City of Orland and Glenn County
Case Number: 2:2010cv00154
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for SANCTIONS and FURTHER ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/22/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's counsel, Mr. Eric Nordskog, is to pay sanctions in the amount of $150.00 for his failure to file a response to the 7 /12/2011 OSC. The sum is to be paid within 14 days. Pltf's counsel is further ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned an additional $300.00 for his failure to respond to legal deadlines. Counsel shall file his response on or before 9/2/2011. The hearing on Dfts' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment currently set for 9/2/2011 is VACATED and RESET for 9/16/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Zignago, K.)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/8/2011 ORDERING Pltf's counsel to show cause why he should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $150.00 for failing to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to dfts motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(c); Response to the Order to Show Cause due by 8/19/2011. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing RESET for 9/2/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. (Michel, G)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/24/10: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/16/2012. Discovery due by 5/2/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/7/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. Jury Trial set for 1/29/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/10/10 ORDERING Discovery due 2/21/12; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 3/6/2012; Motions shall be heard no later than 6/29/2012; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2012 at 01:30 PM i n Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr..; Jury Trial set for 10/30/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr..; this Status Order will become final without further order of the court unless objections are fled within 14 days of service of this order. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Lopeteguy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Lopeteguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blair
Represented By: Eric L. Nordskog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?