AtPac, Inc v. Aptitude Solutions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: AtPac, Inc.
Defendant: Aptitude Solutions, Inc., County of Nevada and Gregory J. Diaz
Case Number: 2:2010cv00294
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/3/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's 171 Request to Seal Documents is GRANTED and this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/2011 ORDERING that the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) deadline is extended to 8/8/2011 and rebuttal reports, if any, are now due 8/29/2011. In light of the foregoing order, no status conference on 6/13/2011 is necessary. (Zignago, K.)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/31/11 DENYING 166 Ex Parte Application. For purposes of the motion referenced in plaintiffs ex parte application, the parties are relieved of the letter briefing requirement set forth in 56 Order. Said motion may be noticed on the undersigneds regular law and motion calendar. (Meuleman, A)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/18/11 ORDERING pltf's request for reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's 5/2/11 Order 162 is DENIED. (Carlos, K)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/2/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's request for forensic examination is DENIED. The temporal scope of the waiver of privilege is limited to documents existing at the time of the 11/18/2010 order. Billing records need not be produced as those documents are not likely to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/19/11 ORDERING that Designation of Expert Witnesses is due by 7/1/2011.. (Manzer, C)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/12/2011 ORDERING that Dfts' 91 motion for appointment of a special master and stay is DENIED. Pltf's 112 motion for terminating sanctions or, in the alternative, issue sanctions is DENIED to the extent Pltf seeks default sanctions and GRANTED to the extent Pltf seeks an adverse inference jury instruction. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/11 ORDERING dft Aptitude's motion for partial summary judgment 80 is DENIED. (Carlos, K)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/8/2011 DENYING 151 Stipulation for Extended Supplemental Briefing. The court takes Aptitude's 80 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under submission without any supplemental briefing or arguments. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/9/3011 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED all pleadings and other materials submitted in support of or opposition to any pending motions be filed under seal. This order is subject to reconsideration upon the application of any party to this lawsuit, or any other interested party. The parties should further be aware that the court has no intention of filing under seal its Order, or any portions thereof, on any pending motions. (Reader, L)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S) signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/4/11. The Clerk is ORDERED to SEAL all exhibits in support of AtPac's 112 Motion for Sanctions; and AtPac's Points and Authorities in Support of it's motion for sanction. These documents shall remain sealed unless and until a further order is issued by the Court. (Kastilahn, A)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/18/2011 re 95 Defendants' Notice of Request to Seal Document(s): Because it is difficult and impracticable to seal only specified pages of a document, the court will order sealed the entire documents containing the specified pages the parties ask to have sealed. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Docket entries 91 and 92 be filed under seal. This order shall be subject to reconsideration on the motion of any party or other interested person to this action. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/14/2010 DENYING 61 Defendants' MOTION for RECONSIDERATION by District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling Dated 11/18/2010. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/10 ORDERING that reasonable expenses incurred in connection with the motion to compel are awarded to plaintiff against defendants in the amount of $20,250.00. (Becknal, R)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/18/10: Any objections that defendants did not make in their initial responses to the discovery at issue are overruled. The court finds further clarification of the meaning of technical terms used in the discovery requests is unnecessary. No later than December 17, 2010, defendants shall respond to the requests for admission with unqualified admissions or denials. No later than November 19, 2010, plaintiff's counsel shall submit to t he court a declaration of costs and fees incurred in connection with the motion to compel. The issue of an award under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a) (5) will thereafter stand submitted. No later than December 1, 2010, the parties shall submit a joint proposed protective order, which shall apply prospectively. (Kaminski, H)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER 43 to modify 29 Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/27/2010. Parties shall disclose any Experts and produce Expert Reports no later than 5/15/2011. Rebuttal Expert shall be revealed and Reports produced on or before 6/15/2011. All Discovery to be completed 9/15/2011. All Motions to be filed from 8/1/2011 until 10/1/2011. (Marciel, M)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/22/10, ORDERING that pltf's motion to compel 32 is granted in part and denied in part. Dfts' motion for protective order 31 is granted in part and denied in part. No later than 1 0/1/10, pltf shall identify the portions of the AtPac CRiis source code that pltf alleges constitute trade secrets. No later than 10/15/10, dfts shall respond to the propounded discovery without objection predicated on California Code of Civil Proced ure § 2019.210. With respect to substantive responses to the propounded discovery, the motion to compel is denied without prejudice to its renewal after further meet and confer and the filing of a joint statement under Local Rule 251. (Kastilahn, A)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/3/10 GRANTING defts' 23 Motion to Dismiss pltf's fourth cause of action. (Owen, K)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/28/2010 ORDERING that that County of Nevada's 13 motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth cause of action be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Aptitude and Diaz's 14 motion fo r judgment on the pleadings on plaintiff's fourth cause of action be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants' motions to strike be, and the same hereby are, DENIED. Plaintiff is given twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint consistent with this Order. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AtPac, Inc v. Aptitude Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AtPac, Inc.
Represented By: William Ross Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aptitude Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?