Guerrero v. McClure et al
Plaintiff: James Anthony Guerrero
Defendant: S. McClure, D. Furguson, J. Fecht, R. Fox and F. Montes
Case Number: 2:2010cv00318
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/11/13 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/1/13 100 are ADOPTED in full; and Defendants' 8/17/12 MOTION for Summary Judgment 83 is GRANTED and Summary Judgment is entered in favor of defendants Fecht, Ferguson and Fox. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/28/13 recommending that defendants August 17, 2012 motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 83 ) be GRANTED and summary judgment be entered in favor of defendants Fecht, Ferguson and Fox. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/26/13 recommending that defendant McClure's motion for summary judgment filed 08/10/12 81 be granted. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 81 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/11/13 ordering defendants' motion to strike plaintiff's additional briefing 94 is denied. The court will consider plaintiff's supplemental filings 87 - 89 and 92 in ruling on the pending motion for summary judgment brought on behalf of defendants Fecht, Ferguson, and Fox. Defendants are granted 7 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief, if any, addressing the merits to plaintiff's additional briefing on the motion. (Plummer, M)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/02/12 denying 52 , 60 Motions for Summary Judgment and denying 78 Motion to Strike. Within 14 days from the service of this order, defendants shall file any re-newed motions for summary judgm ent including the notice to plaintiff requried by the decisions in Woods v. Carey and Rand v. Rowland, utilizing the language contained in the court's order filed on 03/09/10 11 . Plaintiff shall file his opposition within 21 days after service of the motion for summary judgment and defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within 7 days after the opposition is served. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/12/12 ordering that attorney Kelly A. Yokley of the Law Offices of Rivera and Associates is substituted in as counsel of record for defendant F. Montes in place of Deputy Attorney General Michelle Leigh Angus. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/24/12 granting 57 Motion to modify scheduling order and to extend time to file a dispositive motion. Defendant Montes is granted 60 days to and including 05/01/12 to file his dispositive motion. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/12 DENYING 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/20/12 granting 51 Motion to modify scheduling order with respect to the deadline for filing dispositive motions. The parties may file dispositive motions in this action on or before 03/01/12. (Plummer, M)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/02/11 denying 48 Motion to conduct plaintiff's deposition via videoconference. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/28/11 ORDERING that Defendant McClures motion to compel 27 is granted; Plaintiffs motion for a legal assistant 30 is denied; Defendant Fechts motion to compel 31 isgranted as to the interrogat ories and denied as to the request for admission; Defendant Fergusons motion to compel 32 is granted as to the interrogatories and denied as to the request for admission; Defendant Foxs motion to compel 33 is granted as to the interrogatories and denied as to the request for admissions; Defendant Montess motion to compel 34 isgranted as to the interrogatories and denied as to the request for admissions; All of the defendants requests for an order requiring plaintiff to pay expenses incurre d by them in bringing their various motions to compel are denied at this time; Within 30 days from the service of this order, plaintiff shall provide his supplemental responses; No later than 11/18/11, defendants may depose plaintiff, as set forth in the courts 6/29/10 discovery and scheduling order; any motion to compel discovery shall be filed and served by that date; the deadline for the conducting of any other discovery in this action has expired under that scheduling order; and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed and served on or before 1/20/12. Motions shall be briefed in accordance with paragraph 7 of this courts order filed 3/9/10.(Dillon, M)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/07/11 granting 37 Motion to vacate the deadline for dispositive motions. The 01/14/11 deadline for filing dispositive motions, as set forth in the court's 01/29/10 Discovery and Scheduling Order is vacated and will be reset, if necessary, following the court's resolution of the pending discovery motions. (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/10 denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Anthony Guerrero signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/16/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $7.32 and thereafter the $342.68 balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. McClure et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anthony Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Furguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?