Ludwig v. Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County et al
Plaintiff: Susan Ludwig
Defendant: Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County, Verna Magnuson, University of California Davis Medical Center, McKinley Health Center, City of Sacramento Police Department, A. Crosby and Mercy Hospital
Case Number: 2:2010cv00325
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/24/12: Defendant Verna Magnuson dismissed. (Kaminski, H)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER dismissing defendant Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/12. (Kaminski, H)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/1/11 ORDERING the Law Firm of Evans, Wieckowski & Ward, LLP accepts service of the summons and the first amended complaint on behalf of VERNA MAGNUSON; VERNA MAGNUSON is deemed to have joined in the County's motion to dismiss heard on 9/21/11 and agrees to be bound by that ruling as to Count Two of the First Amended Complaint without prejudice to filing a Motion to Dismiss as to Count One of the First Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/12/11 ORDERING that 28 MOTION to DISMISS by Defendant Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County is GRANTED without prejudice to file Amended Complaint. Any Amended Compalint must be served on Defendants within 20 days after the hearing on 9/21/11.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/4/11 ORDERING Officer Mulligan is Dismissed as a party to this action; the claims alleged against the City of Sacramento are Dismissed with Prejudice. The claims are barred by the two year statute of limitat ions. Leave to amend is Denied because amendment of the First Amended Complaint would be futile; the claim for relief alleged against Det. Amy Crosby is Dismissed with Prejudice. The claim is barred by the two year statute of limitations. Leave to amend is Denied because amendment of the First Amended Complaint would be futile. (Becknal, R)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/27/11 GRANTING 24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Catholic Health Care West dba Mercy Hospital.(Matson, R)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 33 granting leave signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/15/2011. Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint on or before 6/29/2011. Hearing on Motions calendared for 6/29/2011 is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/9/2011 ORDERING that the deadline to file the Joint Status Report, currently 6/10/2011, is VACATED and will be rescheduled to a date to be determined by the court, following the court's ruling on several motions currently pending in this action. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/20/11 ORDERING that the referral of this case to the magistrate judge is withdrawn and the case is referred back to the district judge; and the 6/29/11 status (pretrial scheduling) conference currently scheduled before the undersigned, 2 and 14 , is vacated. (Becknal, R)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/8/11, ORDERING that 13 pltf's fourth motion for an extension of time to serve is GRANTED. Pltf has until 4/13/11 to serve the remaining unserved dfts, and file a proof of such service with the court. The Status Conference is CONT'D to 6/29/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. By 6/15/11, the parties shall file status reports or a joint status report. (Kastilahn, A)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/2010 ORDERING 11 Motion for Extension is granted; Plaintiff shall have until January 31, 2011 to serve the remaining unserved defendants and file a proof of such service with the court; Th e status conference currently set for January 5, 2011 is continued to March 30, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24; By March 16, 2011, the parties shall file status reports (or a joint status report) setting forth the matters referenced in the c ourts February 8, 2010 order, including the status of service of process; and Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including a recommendation that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Matson, R)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/22/10 ORDERING that 9 Motion for Extension of time to serve is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall have until 11/10/10 to serve the remaining unserved defendants and file a proof of such service with the court; The status conference currently set for October 27, 2010 is continued to January 5, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24. By December 22, 2010, the parties shall file status reports (or a joint status report) setting forth the matters referenced in the courts February 8, 2010 order, including the status of service of process.(Dillon, M)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/15/10 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 7 is granted; Plaintiff shall have until 9/10/10 to serve the remaining defendants and file proof of service; the 6/2/1 0 order to show cause is discharged; the status conference set for 8/11/10 is reset to 10/27/10, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24; By 10/13/10, the parties shall file status reports (or a joint status report) setting forth the matters referenced in the court's 2/8/10 order, including the status of service of process; and failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Becknal, R)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/2/2010 ORDERING the status conference currently set for 6/9/2010 is continued to 8/11/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. P laintiff shall show cause in writing on or before 7/21/2010. Also by July 21, 2010, the parties shall file status reports (or a joint status report) setting forth the matters referenced in the court's February 8, 2010 order, including the status of service of process. Failure of plaintiff to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including a recommendation that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludwig v. Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Protective Services of Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verna Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Davis Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinley Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?