Bonenfant v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Bonenfant
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00361
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/11 ORDERING that defendant's motion for summary judgment of plaintiff's claims for breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing and plaintiff's request for punitive damages is hereby GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER UPON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/31/11 resetting hearing on 23 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, for 7/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Disposit ive Motions due 7/13/2011, Designation of Expert Witnesses due 7/29/2011; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/14/2011 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Jury Trial reset for 10/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Meuleman, A)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/25/11. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/25/2011. Discovery due by 5/2/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/10/2011. Final Pretrial Conference remains set for 8/12/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Jury Trial remains set for 10/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Williams, D)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/6/11: The parties' "Stipulation Re: Confidentiality and Protective Order Governing Production Or Other Discovery of Portions of Standard Insurance Company's Claims Manual" 14 is not approved, but without prejudice to the refiling of a sufficient proposed stipulated protective order. (Kaminski, H)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER 12 to change deadline signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/27/2010. Non-Expert Discovery shall be CONTINUED to 1/31/2011. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonenfant v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Bonenfant
Represented By: Robert K Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Vana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?