Sullivan et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Plaintiff: Robert Sullivan and Marlene Sullivan
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00384
Filed: February 12, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge:
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER 40 for REMAND signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/29/2012. In light of plaintiffs dismissing their only remaining federal claim, Court is DECLINING to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over remaining state claims andREMANDS plaintiffs remaining six causes of action to Nevada County. [cc: Nevada County Superior Court] (Marciel, M)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/01/10 VACATING 27 Judgment ; Status Conference set for 1/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.; A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to Status Conference. (Williams, D)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/1/2010 ORDERING plaintiffs' TMLA damages claim is dismissed w/prejudice and plaintiffs' state claims are REMANDED to Nevada County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/20/10 ORDERING that Status Conference scheduled for 7/26/10, is CONTINUED to 11/15/2010 at 09:00 AM. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) day prior to Status Conference. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/29/10: Plaintiffs are granted ten (10) days from the date on which this order is filed to file a First-Amended Complaint. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sullivan
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Sullivan
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?