Jones v. Barron et al
Plaintiff: Marcell Jones
Defendant: K. Barron, D. Hitt, T. Perez, T. Robertson, - Vera, N. Grinnis, C. Bryant, J. Flaherdy, D. Swingle, J. Clark Kelso and J. Walker
Case Number: 2:2010cv00396
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/27/2014 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Brian Wanerman is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/30/2014 GRANTING 60 Stipulation and Proposed Order to continue trial and pre-trial conference dates. The trial is CONTINUED to 4/13/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6. The pre-trial conference is CONTINUED to 2/20/2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6, with a joint pre-trial conference statement to be filed no later than 2/13/2015. (Zignago, K.)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/17/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel John R. Parker, Jr., is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/31/13: J.R. Parker is appointed as counsel in this entitled matter. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon J.R. Parker. (Kaminski, H)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/2013 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Marcell Jones, V-67498, via telephonic conferencing on 9/25/2013 at 9:30 AM before Judge John A. Mendez; ORDERING Custodian to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept) (Michel, G)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/23/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Marcell Jones at 07/29/13 at 8:00 a.m. in courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/23/2012 GRANTING plaintiff a period of 15 days in which to file a Rule 60(b) motion in accordance with this order.(Yin, K)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/2012 ADOPTING 24 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING in part, DENYING in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; REFERRING this matter back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Michel, G)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/19/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 18 motion for summary judgment be denied as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim of excessive force against defendant Barron and granted in all other respects; and this matter be referred back to Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for further proceedings. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/19/2011 ORDERING that, w/in 30 days, pltf shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the 18 motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/19/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs 9/29/10 response to the answer filed in this action is disregarded. (Dillon, M)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Marcell Jones signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 05/14/10. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Barron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcell Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Flaherdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?