Pruitt et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: John Pruitt, Darryl Berg, Debra Berg, Isaiah Pruitt, John Pruitt, Jr., Michael Pruitt and Phillip Pruitt
Defendant: County of Sacramento, John McGinness, Santos Ramos, Sean Berry, Brad Rose, Randy Moya, Jacqueline Kloss, Kevin Steed, Timothy Ruiz, Steve Wharton, Thomas Lynn, Craig Harmon and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv00416
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Filing 92 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Darryl Berg, John Pruitt. (Mehta, Leslie)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER #87 to Deposit Money into blocked account signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/2011. John Pruitt, as Guardian Ad Litem for Phillip Pruitt, is directed deposit $2500.00 in to blocked account plus any accrued interest. John Pruitt or his attorney shall deliver a copy of this Order to each depository in which funds are deposited. (Marciel, M)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER #87 to Deposit Money into blocked account signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/2011. John Pruitt, as Guardian Ad Litem for Michael Pruitt, is directed deposit $2500.00 in to blocked account plus any accrued interest. John Pruitt or his attorney shall deliver a copy of this Order to each depository in which funds are deposited. (Marciel, M)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER #87 to Deposit Money into blocked account signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/2011. John Pruitt, as Guardian Ad Litem for John Pruitt Jr., is directed deposit $2500.00 in to blocked account plus any accrued interest. John Pruitt or his attorney shall deliver a copy of this Order to each depository in which funds are deposited. (Marciel, M)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER #87 to Deposit Money into blocked account signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/2011. John Pruitt, as Guardian Ad Litem for Isaiah Pruitt, is directed deposit $2500.00 in to blocked account plus any accrued interest. John Pruitt or his attorney shall deliver a copy of this Order to each depository in which funds are deposited. (Marciel, M)
September 7, 2011 Filing 87 EX PARTE APPLICATION by John Pruitt for Orders to Deposit Money into Blocked Accounts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Isaiah Pruitt, #2 Proposed Order re John Pruitt, Jr., #3 Proposed Order re Michael Pruitt, #4 Proposed Order re Phillip Pruitt)(Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 9/12/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/31/2011 ORDERING #72 Motion for Approval of minors' compromise be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. (Waggoner, D)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/23/11 APPOINTING John Pruitt as guardian ad litem for petitioner Phillip Pruitt. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/23/11 APPOINTING John Pruitt as guardian ad litem for petitioner Michael Pruitt. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/23/11 APPOINTING John Pruitt as guardian ad litem for petitioner John Pruitt, Jr. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/23/11 APPOINTING John Pruitt as guardian ad litem for petitioner Isaiah Pruitt. (Benson, A.)
August 22, 2011 Filing 81 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Sean Berry to #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. Attorney Lavra, John A. added. (Lavra, John) Modified on 8/25/2011 (Zignago, K.).
August 19, 2011 Filing 80 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton to #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. (Cassidy, Terence)
August 12, 2011 Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER granting #19 #20 #21 #22 Petitions for Appointment of John Pruitt as Guardian Ad Litem. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 78 PROPOSED ORDER granting #76 Request to submit #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise on papers without hearing by John Phillip Pruitt. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 77 PROPOSED ORDER granting unopposed #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise by John Phillip Pruitt. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 76 REQUEST to submit #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise on paper without hearing by John Phillip Pruitt. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 75 DECLARATION of John Pruitt in support of #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M)
August 12, 2011 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Geri Lynn Green in support of #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Sanford Jay Rosen in support of #72 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
August 12, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION for APPROVAL of Minors' Compromise by John Phillip Pruitt. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Rosen, Sanford) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/9/2011 #69 ORDERING Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 8/15/2011; Discovery due by 10/31/2011; Dispositive or Evidentiary Motions filed by 12/1/2011; Trial reset for 5/8/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/21/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb.(Reader, L)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/08/11 ORDERING the revised Stipulated Protective Order filed by the parties #68 is APPROVED with the modification that the Court personnel identified in paragraph 3(d)2 and the finder of fact identified in paragraph 3(f) of the Stipulated Protective Order shall not be subject to paragraphs 4, 10, and 153 of the Stipulated Protective Order.(Williams, D)
March 7, 2011 Filing 69 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify Status (Pre-Trial Scheduling) Order by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Kreutz, Kevin)
February 14, 2011 Filing 68 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Kreutz, Kevin)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/10/11 ORDERING the parties' Stipulated Protective Order #66 is not approved, but without prejudice to the refiling of a sufficient proposed stipulated protective order if the parties are unable to reach a private agreement. (Carlos, K)
February 9, 2011 Filing 66 STIPULATION and Protective Order by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Kreutz, Kevin)
February 3, 2011 Filing 65 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to #51 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton.(Kreutz, Kevin) Modified on 2/4/2011 (Duong, D).
February 3, 2011 Filing 64 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand by Sean Berry to #1 Second Amended Complaint.(Lindsey-Doyle, Amy) Modified on 2/4/2011 (Duong, D).
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/21/11 ORDERING that the time within which all parties must disclose experts and produce expert reports pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure be extended from March 1, 2011 to and including a new deadline of May 15, 2011. (Becknal, R)
January 21, 2011 Filing 62 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadline by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Kreutz, Kevin)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/20/2011 DENYING #55 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 18, 2011 Filing 60 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 1/18/2011 re #55 Defendant Sean Berry's Amended Motion to Dismiss. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. Court shall issue a separate order. Plaintiffs Counsel Lisa Ells present. Defendants Counsel Kevin Kreutz, Amy Lindsey-Doyle present. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 11, 2011 Filing 59 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton in re #58 Reply,. (Kreutz, Kevin)
January 11, 2011 Filing 58 REPLY by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton re #55 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending #54 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kreutz, Kevin)
January 4, 2011 Filing 57 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Darryl Anthony Berg, John Phillip Pruitt in re #56 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint)(Ells, Lisa)
January 4, 2011 Filing 56 OPPOSITION to #55 Amended Motion to Dismiss by Darryl Anthony Berg, John Phillip Pruitt. (Ells, Lisa) Modified on 1/5/2011 (Manzer, C).
October 29, 2010 Filing 55 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending #54 MOTION to DISMISS by Sean Berry. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Lindsey-Doyle, Amy)
October 28, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION to DISMISS by Sean Berry. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Part 1, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Lindsey-Doyle, Amy)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/21/2010 ORDERING that the time within which all Dfts must file a response to Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint is EXTENDED from 10/21/2010 to 10/28/2010. (Zignago, K.)
October 20, 2010 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Response by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Kreutz, Kevin)
October 4, 2010 Filing 51 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Phillip Pruitt. Attorney Mehta, Leslie Chambers added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehta, Leslie) Modified on 10/5/2010 (Williams, D).
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/14/10 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS the seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, fourteenth, and fifteenth claims as against the named defendants is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in all other respects Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS the FAC is DENIED. Plaintiffs are given 20 days from the date of this order to file a Second Amended Complaint, if they can do so consistent with this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/24/10: The court concludes that 2:08-cr-0103 LKK is NOT RELATED to 2:10-cv-0416 WBS KJN and therefore DECLINES to relate the two. (Donati, J)
September 13, 2010 Filing 49 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/2010 re #39 MOTION to DISMISS and #43 MOTION to DISMISS. Parties presented their arguments. Court agrees to dismiss the Bivens claims against the named defendants. Matter submitted, written order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Lisa Ellis present. Defendants Counsel Kevin Kreutz and Amy Lindsey-Doyle present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kathy Swinhart. (Streeter, J)
September 3, 2010 Filing 47 JOINT REPLY by dfts in support of #39 MOTION to DISMISS. Attorney Kreutz, Kevin Matthew added. (Kreutz, Kevin) Modified on 9/7/2010 (Duong, D).
August 30, 2010 Filing 46 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #45 Opposition to Motion filed by John Phillip Pruitt. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 8/31/2010 (Kaminski, H).
August 30, 2010 Filing 45 OPPOSITION by John Phillip Pruitt to #39 MOTION to DISMISS, #43 MOTION to DISMISS. (Galvan, Ernest)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/5/10: Discovery due by 7/1/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/1/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb.Trial set for 1/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
August 5, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to state a claim by dft Sean Berry. Attorney Lindsey-Doyle, Amy Brie'Ann added. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Lindsey-Doyle, Amy) Modified on 8/6/2010 (Duong, D).
July 26, 2010 Filing 42 STATEMENT of Joint Status Report and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Plaintiffs Darryl Anthony Berg, Debra Berg. (Galvan, Ernest)
July 14, 2010 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER re #39 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. (Cassidy, Terence)
July 14, 2010 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton re #39 MOTION to DISMISS. (Cassidy, Terence)
July 14, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Cassidy, Terence)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/10 ORDERING that the time within which the Defendants must file a response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint be extended from 7/2/10 (Defendant County), 7/6/10 (Defendant WHARTON) and 7/9/10 (all other Defendants) to and including a new deadline of 7/14/10. (Becknal, R)
July 1, 2010 Filing 37 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time in Which to File Response to First Amended Complaint by County of Sacramento, Craig Harmon, Jacqueline Kloss, Thomas Lynn, John McGinness, Randy Moya, Santos Ramos, Brad Rose, Timothy Ruiz, Kevin Steed, Steve Wharton. Attorney Cassidy, Terence John added. (Cassidy, Terence)
June 21, 2010 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steve Wharton served on 6/7/2010, answer due 6/28/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 35 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Sean Berry Waiver sent on 6/7/2010, answer due 8/6/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Timothy Ruiz served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brad Rose served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Santos Ramos served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Randy Moya served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John McGinness served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Thomas Lynn served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jacqueline Kloss served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Craig Harmon served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 18, 2010 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kevin Steed served on 6/18/2010, answer due 7/9/2010. (Ells, Lisa)
June 5, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Unavailability by all plaintiffs. (Green, Geri)
June 4, 2010 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Time in Which to File Responsive Pleading by Steve Wharton. Attorney Horan, Stephen E. added. (Horan, Stephen)
June 4, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint by County of Sacramento. Attorney Lavra, John A. added. (Lavra, John) Modified on 6/7/2010 (Kaminski, H).
May 26, 2010 Filing 22 PETITION for Appointment of John Phillip Pruitt as Guardian Ad Litem for Phillip Pruitt and Proposed Order. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
May 26, 2010 Filing 21 PETITION for Appointment of John Phillip Pruitt as Guardian Ad Litem for Michael Pruitt and Proposed Order. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M).
May 26, 2010 Filing 20 PETITION for Appointment of John Pruitt, Jr. as Guardian Ad Litem and Proposed Order. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 8/15/2011 (Marciel, M)
May 26, 2010 Filing 19 PETITION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Isaiah Pruitt and Proposed Order by John Phillip Pruitt. (Galvan, Ernest)
May 25, 2010 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Timothy Ruiz served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steve Wharton served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Randy Moya served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kevin Steed served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jacqueline Kloss served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Thomas Lynn served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Craig Harmon served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John McGinness served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sean Berry served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brad Rose served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Santos Ramos served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 25, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 5/18/2010. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Williams, D).
May 12, 2010 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED by John Phillip Pruitt. Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 5/13/2010 (Kirksey Smith, K).
February 18, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:08-CR-00103 by John Phillip Pruitt. (Galvan, Ernest)
February 18, 2010 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento, John McGinness, Ramos, Sean Berry, Brad Rose, Randy Moya, Kloss, Steed, Timothy Ruiz, Wharton, Thomas Lynn, Craig Harmon, United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Geri Lynn Green* *Law Offices of Geri Lynn Green, LC* *155 Montgomery Street, Suite 901* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Debra Berg, John Phillip Pruitt, Darryl Anthony Berg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galvan, Ernest)
February 18, 2010 RECEIPT number #CAE200023948 $350.00 fbo John Phillip Pruitt et al by Ernest Galvan on 2/18/2010. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pruitt
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Berg
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Berg
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Pruitt
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pruitt, Jr.
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pruitt
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Pruitt
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Represented By: Lisa Adrienne Ells
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Leslie Chambers Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos Ramos
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Berry
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Rose
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moya
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Kloss
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Steed
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ruiz
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wharton
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lynn
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Harmon
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?