Lewis v. People of The State of California
Petitioner: Jimmy Lewis
Respondent: People of The State of California
Case Number: 2:2010cv00422
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 4/23/12: The Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. (Kaminski, H)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/21/10 ORDERING that Petitioners 20 request for a federal appeal form is denied; Petitioners 21 motion for extension of time is granted; and Petitioner is granted thirty days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a response to respondents 9/21/10 motion to dismiss. Respondents reply, if any, shall be filed and served not later than ten days thereafter. (Dillon, M)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/28/2010 ORDERING that peititoner has 30 days to file an amended petition; and the clerk to send petitioner a hc form.(Yin, K) Modified on 7/1/2010 (Plummer, M).
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/22/10 ORDERING that 7 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Petitioners application for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended petition within 30 days from the date of this order; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the form for habeas corpus application.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?