Brown v. Brasher
Plaintiff: Bryant Keith Brown
Defendant: D. Brasher
Case Number: 2:2010cv00479
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/27/2012 RECOMMENDING that 22 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, 23 MOTION to set for pretrial conference be denied, clerk enter judgment in favor of defendant and that the clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Donati, J)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/4/11 denying 19 Motion. (Dillon, M)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Bryant Keith Brown signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/19/2010. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Keith Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?