Mays v. Clark
Petitioner: Darious A Mays
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 2:2010cv00533
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 3/26/12 RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied; and a certificate of appealability not issue. Matter referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/30/12, ORDERING that respondent is directed to obtain and furnish to the court, within 10 days of the date of this order, a video or compact disc recording of the entire interview between Detective Husted and Mays, or to SHOW CAUSE why a copy cannot be produced. (Kastilahn, A)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 10/25/2011 ORDERING Respondent to obtain and furnish the court with a copy of the video recording of Detective Husteds 2/9/2005 interview with Petitioner Mays. (Michel, G)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 Motion to withdraw signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/31/10. Petitioner's request for an additional 60 days in which to file a traverse is denied. Petitioner's traverse is due on or before 09/28/10. (Plummer, M)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/16/2010 ORDERING 20 Petitioner's motion to stay under Rhines is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner may file a motion to stay pursuant to King v. Ryan, if appropriate, within 30 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's 23 8/4/2010 motion is DENIED. (Reader, L)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/2/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010) [Transferred from cand on 3/5/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darious A Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?