Olvera v County of Sacramento, et al
Plaintiff: AGD-O, AND-O, CHD-O, COD-O, Carla De Rose, GD-O, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera, RD-O and SD-O
Defendant: Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Scott Fera, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Chris Guillone, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Traci Lee, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla and Lisa Travis
Case Number: 2:2010cv00550
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Filing 222 Plaintiffs' RECEIPT and acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of money into blocked account. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Main Document 222 replaced on 8/13/2014) (Donati, J).
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION and ORDER #220 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/18/2014 DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear his or her own costs and attorneys' fees. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 15, 2014 Filing 220 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED EX-PARTE PETITION FOR MINORS' COMPROMISE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/19/14. The 6/24/14 Jury Trial is vacated. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
May 19, 2014 Filing 218 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Petition of Minors' Compromise by Defendant Chris Guillone re #214 Ex Parte Application. (Wieckowski, Carol)
May 16, 2014 Filing 217 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Amended Petition for Minors' Compromise by Defendants Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla re #216 Amended Document. (O'Dea, Mark)
May 16, 2014 Filing 216 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carla De Rose: Amended #214 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert R. Powell, #2 Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert)
May 15, 2014 Filing 215 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Minors' Compromise Petition by Defendants Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla re #214 Ex Parte Application. (O'Dea, Mark)
May 15, 2014 Filing 214 EX PARTE APPLICATION for minors' compromise by Carla De Rose for Minors' Compromise. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert R. Powell, #2 Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 5/15/2014 (Kaminski, H).
May 5, 2014 Filing 213 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE Re Petition for Minors' Compromise held on 5/5/2014. Court confers with counsel re petition and status of case settlement. Counsel inform the Court that the matter has settled. Court informs the parties that no medical reports will need to be provided, and that the minor plaintiffs will not have to be present for a hearing. Court grants leave for plaintiffs to file the petition via ex parte application. Plaintiffs' application shall be filed within 10 days from today, at which time the Jury Trial date of 6/24/2014 will be vacated. Plaintiffs Counsel Dennis Ingols present. Defendants Counsel Greg O'Dea, Carol Wieckowski present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Stipulation and Order #211 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/1/2014 setting a Telephone Status Conference for 5/5/2014 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to particpate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 1, 2014 Filing 211 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER requesting Telephonic Conference by Carla De Rose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting request) (Powell, Robert) Modified on 5/1/2014 (Marciel, M)
August 28, 2013 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 25, 2013, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Phone number 916-446-1347 E-mail kswinhartcsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2013. (Swinhart, K)
June 25, 2013 Filing 209 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: STATUS CONFERENCE Re Motions in Limine held on 6/25/2013. Court confers with counsel re #208 Defendant Guillone's Ex Parte Application to Continue the Jury Trial date. Counsel argue. Court GRANTS Defendant Guillone's request and continued the Jury Trial date to 6/24/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Court confers with counsel re pending motions in limine and rules as follows: Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine #176 : 1) To Bifurcation of punitive damages: DENIED; 2) To Exclude Testimony re the work of social workers investigations of child abuse is difficult, etc.: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial; 3) To Preclude Admission of "Draft" Application: DENIED; 4) Outcome of Juvenile Court Proceedings is Inadmissible: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial; and 5) To Exclude Testimony Re Dismissed Claims: Agreed upon by Counsel - MOOT. Defendants Lopez, Rogers, Solla, Schrage & Christian's Motions in Limine #171 (Joined by Defendants Travis & Guillon): 1) To preclude plaintiffs from offering any testimony from plaintiff CHD-O: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial; 2) To preclude plaintiffs from offering evidence re dismissed claims: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial; 3) To preclude plaintiffs from offering evidence re material exculpatory evidence re CHD-O: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial; and 4) To preclude plaintiffs from offering evidence re injury of Mr. Olvera, Ms. DeRose, or minor children as a result of removal of CHD-O: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial. Defendants Travis & Guillon's Motion in Limine #173 : 1) Request to Limit Evidence as to Second Claim: HELD IN ABEYANCE pending evidence presented at time of trial. Plaintiffs Counsel Robert Powell, Brett Terry, Dennis Ingols present. Defendants Counsel Mark O'Dea, Greg O'Dea, Carol Wieckowski present. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 24, 2013 Filing 208 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Continuance of Trial by Lisa Travis for Continuance of Trial. (Wieckowski, Carol)
June 21, 2013 Filing 207 OBJECTIONS by defendants Chris Guillone and Lisa Travis to plaintiffs' #201 Exhibit List. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 206 OBJECTIONS by defendants to #201 Exhibit List. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 205 OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Carla De Rose to defendants' #203 Exhibit List. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 204 WITNESS LIST by defendants Chris Guillone and Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 203 EXHIBIT LIST by defendants Chris Guillone and Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 202 OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Carla De Rose to #197 Exhibits. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 201 EXHIBIT LIST by plaintiff Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2013 (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2013 Filing 200 WITNESS LIST by Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert)
June 20, 2013 Filing 199 CPS DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF LODGING ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K).
June 20, 2013 Filing 198 CPS DEFENDANTS' WITNESS LIST by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K).
June 20, 2013 Filing 197 CPS DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT LIST by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K).
June 19, 2013 Filing 196 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Exhibits by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 19, 2013 Filing 195 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Verdict forms of County Counsel submitted by Plaintiff Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 19, 2013 Filing 194 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Verdict forms of CPS defendants submitted by Plaintiff Carla De Rose.(Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 19, 2013 Filing 193 OBJECTIONS to CPS Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions by Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 19, 2013 Filing 192 OBJECTIONS to County Counsel Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions by Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 18, 2013 Filing 191 RESPONSE to SW Defendants' Trial Brief and OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Motions in Limine by Carla De Rose. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 18, 2013 Filing 190 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla to #176 Trial Brief. (O'Dea, Mark)
June 18, 2013 Filing 189 TRIAL BRIEF by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark)
June 18, 2013 Filing 188 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Counsel are hereby notified that hearing on all pending motions in limine as outlined in the trial briefs #171 , #173 , #176 will be set for 6/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The first day of Jury Trial will then commence on 6/26/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 17, 2013 Filing 187 CPS Defendants' NOTICE OF ERRATA re #186 Proposed Verdict, #185 Proposed Jury Instructions. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/18/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 14, 2013 Filing 186 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Defendants Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark)
June 14, 2013 Filing 185 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark)
June 14, 2013 Filing 184 OBJECTIONS to #178 Proposed Jury Verdict by Defendants Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/17/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 14, 2013 Filing 183 OBJECTIONS to #177 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendants Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 6/17/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 14, 2013 Filing 182 OBJECTIONS to Motions In Limine by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/17/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 14, 2013 Filing 181 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis.(Wieckowski, Carol)
June 14, 2013 Filing 180 OBJECTIONS to #177 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/17/2013 (Manzer, C).
June 14, 2013 Filing 179 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis to #178 Proposed Verdict. (Wieckowski, Carol)
June 11, 2013 Filing 178 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Plaintiff Carla De Rose.(Powell, Robert)
June 11, 2013 Filing 177 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Carla De Rose.(Powell, Robert)
June 11, 2013 Filing 176 TRIAL BRIEF by Carla De Rose.(Powell, Robert)
June 11, 2013 Filing 175 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Carla De Rose.(Powell, Robert)
June 11, 2013 Filing 174 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis.(Wieckowski, Carol)
June 11, 2013 Filing 173 TRIAL BRIEF and MOTIONS in LIMINE by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis.(Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 6/12/2013 (Reader, L).
June 11, 2013 Filing 172 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark)
June 11, 2013 Filing 171 TRIAL BRIEF by Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits, #2 Declaration Mark P. O'Dea and Exhibit)(O'Dea, Mark)
May 30, 2013 Filing 170 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/30/2013. After settlement negotiations, CASE NOT SETTLED. Court noted if all counsel, between now and the beginning of trial, are in agreement that a further settlement conference would be beneficial, the court would accomodate counsels' request. Plaintiffs Counsel Bret Terry, Robert Powell, Ronald Haven present; Plaintiff Edward Olvera and Carla De Rose present.Defendants Counsel Greg O'Dea, Mark O'Dea, Carol Wieckowski present; John DeRosa - Sacramento CPS present.Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/1. (Buzo, P)
May 23, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Defendants Wendy Christian, Jeanine Lopez, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 5/24/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
May 23, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Terry, Brett)
May 23, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Traci Lee. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 5/24/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/17/2013 ORDERING that the plaintiffs lodge and serve all jury instructions and a proposed verdict form 10 court days prior to trial; ORDERING that the defendants file and serve proposed jury instructions, any objections to Plaintiffs' instructions, a proposed verdict form and any objections the the plaintiff's proposed verdict form 7 days prior to trial; ORDERING that the plaintiffs file and serve any objections to defendants' proposed jury instructions and proposed verdict form 4 court days prior to trial; ORDERING that each party submit all proposed voir dire questions and trial briefs, including any motions in limine, 14 calendar days prior to trial; ORDERING that each party file any oppositions to motions in limine 7 calendar days prior to trial; ORDERING that each party file and serve a statement designating all answers to interrogatories and all portions of depositions intended to be offered into evidence 20 days prior to trial; ORDERING that each party file and serve a counter-designation of portions of the same depositions intended to be offered into evidence and objections to any other parties' designation 10 days prior to trial; CONFIRMING a Trial date of 6/25/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge Willaim B. Shubb; CONFIRMING a Settlement Conference date of 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd; ORDERING that any objections to this Pretrial Order be filed and served within 5 court days. (Michel, G)
April 15, 2013 Filing 165 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/15/2013. Court confers with counsel re the parties' pretrial statements, remaining claims, possible bifurcation, trial procedures and jury selection. Court orders that the trial will not be bifurcated. Court orders this action referred for the random selection of a settlement judge: The parties are hereby notified that a Settlement Conference is set before the Hon. Dale A. Drozd, Magistrate Judge, on 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27, 8th Floor. Each party is directed to have a principal capable of disposition at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms at the Settlement Conference. Each party is further directed to submit via email to DADorders@caed.uscourts.gov a confidential settlement conference statement no later than 12:00 PM (Noon) on 5/23/2013. Such statements are not to be filed with the clerk, although the parties may agree, or not, to serve each other with the settlement statements. However, each party shall e-file a one page document entitled "Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement." If the settlement judge is not the trial judge, the Confidential Settlement Conference Statement shall not be disclosed to the trial judge. Court and counsel discuss trial estimate. Court to issue separate pretrial order. Plaintiffs Counsel Robert Powell, Ronald Haven present. Defendants Counsel Mark O'Dea, Carol Wieckowski present. Court Reporter: Michelle Babbitt. cc: Mag. Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 8, 2013 Filing 164 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis.(Wieckowski, Carol)
April 8, 2013 Filing 163 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendants Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla.(O'Dea, Mark)
April 1, 2013 Filing 162 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiffs AGD-O, AND-O, CHD-O, COD-O, Carla De Rose, GD-O, Edward Olvera, RD-O, SD-O.(Powell, Robert)
March 22, 2013 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 11, 2013, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 4/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2013. (Bodene, C)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/18/2013 ORDERING that plaintiffs' #151 motion to appoint DeRose as guardian ad litem for plaintiffs AND-O, CHD-O, COD-O, SD-O, AGD-O, GD-O, and RD-O nunc pro tunc to the date this action was filed is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' fifth claim under 1983 against all defendants and all claims against Fermine Perez, Laura Coulthard, Lynn Frank, Joni Edison, Keeva Pierce, Stephanie Lynch, Veronica Carrillo, Fred Demartin, Kim Pearson, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, and Melinda Lake are DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the first claim under 1983 for violation of the Fourth Amendment against Lopez and Solla is DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the eighth claim under 1983 for violation of the Fourth Amendment is DENIED as to Christian and GRANTED as to all remaining defendants. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the third and fourth claims under 1983 for violations of plaintiffs' rights to familial association is GRANTED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on CHD-O's second claim under 1983 for a violation of his Fourth Amendment rights is GRANTED as to all defendants except Lopez, Schrage, Travis, and Guillon. County of Sacramento, DHHS, and CPS's motion for summary judgment on all Monell claims is GRANTED. Travis and Guillon's motion for summary judgment on the ground of absolute immunity relating to the staffings and drafting of the PCW is DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the sixth claim for IIED is GRANTED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the seventh claim for IIED is DENIED as to Rogers and GRANTED as to all remaining defendants. (Zignago, K.)
March 11, 2013 Filing 159 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 3/11/2013 re #127 County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment, #128 Defendants Lisa Travis and Chrisophe Guillon's Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication and #148 Plaintiffs' Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Appointment of Carla De Rose as Guardian Ad Litem. Counsel argue. MOTIONS SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs Counsel Brett Terry, Dennis Ingols present. Defendants Counsel Mark O'Dea, Carol Wieckowski present. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 26, 2013 Filing 158 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by defendants Chris Guillone and Lisa Travis to #151 Amended #148 Motion to Appoint Carla De Rose Nunc Pro Tunc Guardian Ad Litem. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 2/26/2013 (Marciel, M)
February 26, 2013 Filing 157 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by defendant to #151 Amended #148 Motion to Appoint Carla De Rose Nunc Pro Tunc Guardian Ad Litem. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 2/26/2013 (Marciel, M)
February 15, 2013 Filing 156 ADDITIONAL DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Carla De Rose, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 2/19/2013 (Kaminski, H).
February 5, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by All Plaintiffs : Deposition Transcripts. (Terry, Brett)
February 4, 2013 Filing 154 REPLY by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis to RESPONSE to #128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Wieckowski, Carol)
February 4, 2013 Filing 153 REPLY by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla re #127 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Statement Reply, #2 Declaration of Mark P. O'Dea, #3 Exhibit A)(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 2/5/2013 (Kaminski, H).
January 29, 2013 Filing 152 DECLARATION of Carla De Rose in SUPPORT OF #151 AMENDED MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert R. Powell, #2 Amended Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Reader, L).
January 29, 2013 Filing 151 AMENDED #148 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM Nunc Pro Tunc Appointment of Carla De Rose set for hearing on 3/11/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K). Modified on 1/30/2013 (Reader, L).
January 29, 2013 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that hearing on #127 County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment and #128 Defendants Lisa Travis and Chrisophe Guillon's Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication (Joinder in County's Motion) is reset for 3/11/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 29, 2013 Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that #148 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem has been improperly noticed pursuant to Local Rule 230(b). The motion shall be heard on 3/11/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Counsel for plaintiffs is instructed to immediately file and serve an amended notice of motion setting forth the above-referenced date and time, or plaintiffs may file an application and request for leave to shorten time, along with a proposed order, to have the motion heard on 2/25/2012 pursuant to Local Rule 144(e). Said application and proposed order (or amended notice) shall be filed and served on all counsel of record forthwith, or the motion shall be stricken. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 29, 2013 Filing 148 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM Nunc Pro Tunc Appointment of Carla De Rose by Carla De Rose set for 2/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Statement of Consent of Carla De Rose, #2 Declaration of Robert R. Powell, #3 Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K). Modified on 1/30/2013 (Reader, L).
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/22/2013 GRANTING plaintiffs' #135 Motion to modify Scheduling Order. No later than 2/15/2013, plaintiffs may redesignate Dr. Federici as an expert who will opine on Dr. Scott's IME and report. Dr. Federici's additional report shall be provided at time of redesignation. Plaintiffs shall make Dr. Federici available for deposition no later than 3/8/2013. Said deposition may be conducted by videoconference. In light of availability of videoconferencing, Court is DECLINING to order payment of travel expenses. (Marciel, M)
January 21, 2013 Filing 146 OPPOSITION by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera to #127 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' (Social Workers) Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Carla DeRose, #3 Declaration of Edward Olvera (w/Exhibits A-B), #4 Declaration of Robert R. Powell [In Support of Opposition], #5 Exhibits A-F to Declaration of Robert Powell, #6 Exhibits G-K to Declaration of Robert Powell, #7 Exhibits L-O to Declaration of Robert Powell, #8 Exhibits P-Z to Declaration of Robert Powell, #9 Exhibits AA-RR to Declaration of Robert Powell)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 21, 2013 Filing 145 OPPOSITION by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera to #128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' (County Counsels') Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 14, 2013 Filing 144 REPLY by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera to RESPONSE to #135 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/15/2013 (Zignago, K.).
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/12/2013 ORDERING #135 Plaintiffs Opposition shall be filed on or before 1/21/2013, any reply due by 2/4/2013; Motions Hearing #127 , #128 on Motion for Summary Judgment Reset for 2/25/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Trial Reset for 6/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Pretrial Conference Reset for 4/15/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
January 11, 2013 Filing 142 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Amy Lindsey-Doyle and Jeri Lynn Pappone terminated (O'Dea, Mark)
January 11, 2013 Filing 141 JOINDER by Lisa Travis in. Attorney Jay, Daniel P added. (Jay, Daniel)
January 10, 2013 Filing 140 OPPOSITION to #135 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 1/11/2013 (Michel, G).
January 9, 2013 Filing 139 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER extending time to file an Opposition to #128 Motion for Summary Judgment, modifying the #100 Scheduling Order by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/10/2013 (Michel, G).
January 9, 2013 Filing 138 ***DISREGARD; SEE DOCKET #139 ***MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Oppose MSJ/Reply MSJ/Continue Pre-Trial Conference & Trial by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order RE: EXTENSION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELATED FILINGS AND CONTINUANCES OF UPCOMING HEARINGS, PRE-TRIAL, AND TRIAL)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/9/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K).
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/4/2013: The hearing date of 2/6/2013 on plaintiffs #135 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is vacated. Opposition, if any, to plaintiffs motion to modify the scheduling order shall be filed no later than 1/10/2013. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 1/14/2013. The matter shall thereafter stand submitted. (Owen, K)
January 4, 2013 Filing 136 PROPOSED ORDER re #135 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/4/2013 (Owen, K).
January 3, 2013 Filing 135 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to Allow Partial Modification of Order (Docket #125) by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Ps and As, #2 Declaration of Robert R. Powell (w/Exhibits A-D), #3 Declaration of Brett O. Terry)(Powell, Robert) Modified on 1/4/2013 (Owen, K).
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER #126 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/2012 ORDERING Defendants Traci Lee and Scott Fera DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). (Krueger, M)
December 11, 2012 Filing 133 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol)
December 11, 2012 Filing 132 NOTICE of Lodging Original Transcripts of Kelly Miess, Edward Olvera, Carla DeRose, Christophe Guillon, and Jeannine Lopez as to Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis re #130 Declaration. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 12/12/2012. Received on 12/11/12 and routed to chambers. (Meuleman, A).
December 11, 2012 Filing 131 EXHIBIT B-K re #128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-G, #2 Exhibit H-K)(Wieckowski, Carol)
December 11, 2012 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Carol A. Wieckowski in SUPPORT OF #128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wieckowski, Carol)
December 11, 2012 Filing 129 STATEMENT of UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS by Defendants Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis re #128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Wieckowski, Carol)
December 11, 2012 Filing 128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Wieckowski, Carol)
December 11, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of M. O'Dea, #4 Exhibits A- H, #5 Exhibit I part 1, #6 Exhibit I part 2, #7 Exhibit J- V part 1, #8 Exhibit J - V part 2, #9 Declaration of Lopez)(O'Dea, Mark)
December 10, 2012 Filing 126 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER of DISMISSAL by Scott Fera, Traci Lee. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 12/11/2012 (Kaminski, H).
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/2012: Defendants' #121 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Defendants motion to compel mental IME of plaintff CHD-O is GRANTED. Said mental examination shall take place on December 7, 2012 at the office of Dr. Scott. No later than December 28, 2012, defendants may disclose Dr. Scott as an expert and plaintiffs may disclose Drs. Clopton and Diamond as experts. The written reports required under F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2)(B) shall be provided at the time of disclosure. The parties shall make their respective experts available for deposition no later than January 25, 2013. So Ordered. (Owen, K)
November 15, 2012 Filing 124 DEFENDANTS' REPLY to plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to modify the scheduling order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark P. O'Dea, #2 Exhibit A)(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2012 (Becknal, R).
November 13, 2012 Filing 123 OPPOSITION To Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Allow for IME by Edward Olvera. Attorney Ingols, Dennis Raymond added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration w/Exhibits A-F)(Ingols, Dennis) Modified on 11/14/2012 (Owen, K).
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/5/12 ORDERING that the hearing date of 12/05/12 on Defendants' MOTION #121 to Modify Scheduling Order is VACATED. Opposition, if any, to Defendants' MOTION to modify the scheduling order and any opposition to Defendants' MOTION to compel mental IME of Plaintff CHD-O shall be filed no later than 11/13/2012. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 11/15/2012. Both matters shall thereafter stand submitted. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 5, 2012 Filing 121 Defendants' MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order; Motion Hearing is SET for 12/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Mark P. O'Dea, #3 Exhibit A-E, #4 Proposed Order)(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 2, 2012 Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that #118 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order for the Purpose of Allowing Defendants to File a Motion to Compel has been improperly noticed before the District Judge, and therefore, the 12/3/2012 hearing date is VACATED. Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(1), this motion is hereby referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge, Carolyn Delaney. The filer is instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Delaney's courtroom clerk for an available hearing date. (KKS)
November 2, 2012 Filing 119 [PROPOSED] ORDER re #118 MOTION Modify Scheduling Order. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 2, 2012 Filing 118 Defendants' MOTION Modify Scheduling Order to Allow Motion for IME to be heard on its merits. Motion Hearing is SET for 12/3/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Mark P. O'Dea, #3 Exhibit A - E)(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 23, 2012 Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/2012: Defendants' #116 Motion to Compel is VACATED as untimely under the Court's Scheduling Order (dkt. no. #20 ), the definition of "completed" thereunder, and the most recent modifications to the Scheduling Order (dkt. nos. #100 , #106 ). So ordered. (Owen, K)
October 23, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION for DISCOVERY To Compel Mental/Psychiatric IME of plaintiff CD-O by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Fred DeMartin, Department of Health and Human Services, Joni Edison, Lynn Frank, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Bryan Jones, Melinda Lake, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Kim Pearson, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Eva Schrage, Solla. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (O'Dea, Mark)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2012 ORDERING #107 Documents Bates stamped nos. 003-015 and 017-027 comprise delivered service logs and chronos of Jeannine Lopez; The claims of attorney-client privilege and attorney work product are OVERRULED as to these documents and shall be produced no later than 10/10/2012; The remaining documents submitted for in camera review need not be produced; Considering all of the circumstances presented on the motion, it appears further deposition of defendants Guillon and Travis is NOT WARRANTED; The motion to compel further deposition is DENIED. (Reader, L)
October 4, 2012 Filing 114 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (Waggoner, D)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/2012 ORDERING defendants to submit, for in camera review, by 10/3/2012, the documents identified in the privilege log; ORDERING that Plaintiff's #107 Motion to Compel shall stand submitted pending the in camera review. (Michel, G)
September 26, 2012 Filing 112 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: MOTION HEARING held on 9/26/2012: Court and counsel confer regarding pending Motion to Compel #107 . Defendants to submit to the court within 7 days discovery documents in question for in camera review. Motion taken under submission; formal order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Robert Powell present. Defendants Counsel Carol Wieckowski, Mark O'Dea present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Judy Streeter/ECRO. (Owen, K) Modified on 9/26/2012 (Owen, K).
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to file documents under seal signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/24/12. (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2012 Filing 110 OPPOSITION by defendants to #107 Motion to Compel. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 9/21/2012 (Becknal, R).
September 20, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Chris Guillone, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 9/24/2012 (Kaminski, H).
September 19, 2012 Filing 108 JOINT STATEMENT regarding motion to compel #107 . Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 9/20/2012 (Becknal, R).
September 4, 2012 Filing 107 MOTION to COMPEL Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by Edward Olvera. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 9/5/2012 (Kaminski, H).
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order #105 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/14/2012: Non-expert discovery, including any discovery related motions, shall be completed on or before October 23, 2012. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 13, 2012 Filing 105 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER modifying the #100 Stipulation and Order by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Terry, Brett) Modified on 8/16/2012 (Michel, G).
July 23, 2012 Filing 104 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Powell, Robert)
July 11, 2012 Filing 103 INITIAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 7/12/2012 (Reader, L).
May 7, 2012 Filing 102 ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Scott Fera, Chris Guillone, Traci Lee, Lisa Travis.(Wieckowski, Carol)
April 20, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #94 Motion to Dismiss by Scott Fera, Chris Guillone, Traci Lee, Lisa Travis. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/26/2012 (Zignago, K.).
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order #99 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/10/2012: Non-expert discovery is continued to 8/14/2012. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure date is continued to 7/11/2012. Defendants Expert Disclosure date is continued to 8/7/2012. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure is continued to 9/4/2012. Expert Discovery Cut Off is continued to 10/23/2012. Dispositive Motion Deadline is continued to 12/11/2012. Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 2/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial is reset for 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 9, 2012 Filing 99 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify Scheduling Order re #67 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by Traci Lee, Lisa Travis, Scott Fera and Christophe Guillon. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/9/2012 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 3, 2012 Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notifed that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dockets #95 , #96 and #97 ) are duplicate motions to #94 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and are hereby terminated and disregarded. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 2, 2012 Filing 97 ***DISREGARD; DUPLICATE MOTION TO #94 *** MOTION to DISMISS by Chris Guillone. Attorney Wieckowski, Carol A. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 2, 2012 Filing 96 ***DISREGARD; DUPLICATE MOTION TO #94 ***MOTION to DISMISS by Scott Fera. Attorney Wieckowski, Carol A. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 2, 2012 Filing 95 ***DISREGARD; DUPLICATE MOTION TO #94 ***MOTION to DISMISS by Lisa Travis. Attorney Wieckowski, Carol A. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 2, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION to DISMISS by Traci Lee, Lisa Travis, Scott Fera and Christophe Guillon. Attorney Wieckowski, Carol A. added. Motion Hearing set for 05/07/12 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Wieckowski, Carol) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 2, 2012 Filing 93 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Eva Schrage. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 92 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Kim Pearson. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 91 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Melinda Lake. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 90 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Patti Gilbert-Driggs. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 89 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Joni Edison. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 88 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Department of Health and Human Services.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 87 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 86 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Fred DeMartin. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
April 2, 2012 Filing 85 ANSWER to #75 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Child Protective Services.(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Benson, A.).
February 23, 2012 Filing 84 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fred DeMartin, Joni Edison, Scott Fera, Patti Gilbert-Driggs, Chris Guillone, Melinda Lake, Traci Lee, Kim Pearson, Eva Schrage, Lisa Travis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brett Terry* *Law Offices Of Robert R Powell* *925 West Hedding Street* *San Jose, CA 95126*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/27/12 ORDERING that defendants' request for reconsideration by the District Court of the Magistrate Judge's 12/15/11, order be, and the same hereby, is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
January 27, 2012 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that #76 Defendants' Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of the Magistrate Judge's Ruling now set for 1/30/2012 is taken off calendar and under submission, no appearance is necessary. The Court shall issue a separate order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 23, 2012 Filing 81 DEFENDANTS' REPLY to Opposition #78 to Motion for Reconsideration. (O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 1/25/2012 (Becknal, R).
January 17, 2012 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Proceedings held on 12/14/2011, before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 2/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2012 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
January 12, 2012 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Brett O. Terry in OPPOSITION TO #76 Motion for Reconsideration. (Terry, Brett)
January 5, 2012 Filing 78 OPPOSITION by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera to #76 Motion for Reconsideration. (Terry, Brett)
December 29, 2011 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that #76 Defendants' Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of the Magistrate Judge's Ruling is set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Briefing on said motion shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 29, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #74 Order on Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Department of Health and Human Services, Lynn Frank, Bryan Jones, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Solla. (O'Dea, Mark)
December 16, 2011 Filing 75 Plaintiffs' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants.(Terry, Brett) Modified on 12/19/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/15/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' #54 motion to compel is GRANTED. The objection based on the attorney-client privilege is overruled for testimony related to staffings/meetings occurring on January 5, January 16, and January 22, 2009, or at any other staffings/meetings related to plaintiffs and their involvement in the County of Sacramento's Juvenile Dependency court system. (Duong, D)
December 14, 2011 Filing 73 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: MOTION HEARING held on 12/14/2011. Court and counsel confer regarding Plaintiff's #54 Motion to Compel. Arguments heard; matter submitted. Court to issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Brett Terry, Dennis Ingols present. Defendants Counsel Mark O'Dea present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Owen, K)
December 8, 2011 Filing 72 EXHIBIT E Page SAC000528 by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera re #68 Statement, #69 Exhibit, #71 Order,. (Terry, Brett)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/8/2011 ORDERING #69 The parties have submitted the joint statement regarding the pending discovery dispute. Referenced therein is Ex. E: SAC 000528. Exhibit E, submitted in support of the motion, does not contain a document with the referenced bate stamp number. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than 12/9/2011, plaintiff shall submit said document to the court. (Reader, L)
December 7, 2011 Filing 70 Plaintiffs' EXHIBITS G-J re #68 Statement, #69 Exhibit. (Terry, Brett) Modified on 12/8/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 7, 2011 Filing 69 EXHIBIT Plaintiffs' Exhibits A-F by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera re #68 Statement. (Terry, Brett)
December 7, 2011 Filing 68 Plaintiffs' JOINT STATEMENT re #54 Motion to Compel testimony. (Terry, Brett) Modified on 12/8/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2011 ORDERING that non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 5/14/2012. That expert witness discovery proceed as follows: Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure: 4/11/2012; Defendants Expert Disclosure: 5/7/2012; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: 6/1/2012; Expert Discovery Cut Off: 7/23/2012. Dispositive Motion Deadline: 9/11/2012. Pretrial Conference: 11/26/2012 at 2:00 p.m. Jury Trial: 1/23/2013 at 9:00 a.m. and continuing for 14 court days. (Zignago, K.)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/11; Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' request to amend the deadlines in the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before May 14, 2012; Expert witness discovery will proceed as follows: plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure: April 11, 2012; defendants' Expert Disclosure: May 7, 2012; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: June 1, 2012; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: July 23, 2012; Dispositive Motion Deadline: September 11, 2012; the Final Pretrial Conference is set for November 26, 2012 at 02:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5; and the jury trial is set for January 23, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5. Plaintiffs shall file their Third Amended Complaint within ten days of the date of this Order.(Matson, R)
December 6, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for modify scheduling order by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terry, Brett) Modified on 12/8/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 5, 2011 Filing 64 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 12/5/2011 re #56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Modify Scheduling Order and Amend Second Amended Complaint. Counsel argue. The Court orders counsel to file a stipulation and proposed order to modify the scheduling order. The Court takes Plaintiff's Motion to Amended UNDER SUBMISSION, and shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs Counsel Brett Terry, Dennis Ingols present. Defendants Counsel Mark O'Dea present. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 28, 2011 Filing 63 REPLY to #60 Opposition to #56 Motion to Amend the #30 Second Amended Complaint by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Terry, Brett) Modified on 11/29/2011 (Michel, G).
November 28, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/28/2011: Pursuant to the parties' #61 Stipulation, the hearing on Plaintiffs' #54 Motion to Compel is RESET for 12/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Owen, K)
November 22, 2011 Filing 61 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for move 12/7 hearing on motion to compel testimony to 12/14 re #54 Motion to Compel testimony by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Move Hearing Date)(Terry, Brett)
November 21, 2011 Filing 60 OPPOSITION by Veronica Carillo, Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Laura Coulthard, County of Sacramento, Jennifer Cullivan, Department of Health and Human Services, Lynn Frank, Bryan Jones, Jeanine Lopez, Stephanie Lynch, Fermine Perez, Keeva Pierce, Robin Rogers, Solla to #56 MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint. (O'Dea, Mark)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/18/11 ORDERING that document 56-3, exhibit B, be replaced with the redacted version of exhibit B that was attached to the stipulation submitted 11/16/11. (Donati, J)
November 16, 2011 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/2011: Notwithstanding the provisions of Local Rule 251, the parties' joint discovery statement required under that Rule shall be filed no later than 11/29/2011. (Owen, K)
November 16, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Redaction of Document 56-3 re #56 MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Terry, Brett)
November 3, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to AMEND the #30 Amended Complaint by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. Attorney Terry, Brett ADDED. Motion Hearing SET for 12/5/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec BOT, #2 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #3 Redacted Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Terry, Brett) Modified on 11/4/2011 (Michel, G). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/21/2011) (Donati, J). [Exhibit B replaced with redacted version pursuant to #59 order. ] Modified on 11/21/2011 (Donati, J).
October 24, 2011 Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/11: Parties are notified that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #54 is CONTINUED to 12/7/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Owen, K)
October 17, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION to COMPEL TESTIMONY by plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 10/19/2011 (Marciel, M).
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re discovery of mental health records signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/2/11: All documents copied are subject to the previously filed protective order in this matter. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for psych records by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order obtain psych records)(Powell, Robert)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 8/22/2011. (Zignago, K.)
August 19, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for mental health records by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order records)(Powell, Robert)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/25/2011 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before January 13, 2012; Expert witness discovery proceed as follows: Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure: December 13, 2011; Defendants' Expert Disclosure: January 6, 2012; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: February 2, 2012; Expert Discovery Cut Off: March 23, 2012; Dispositive Motion Deadline May 16, 2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Duong, D)
July 25, 2011 Filing 47 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Discovery Extension and New Trial Date by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Robert)
July 21, 2011 Filing 46 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Solla. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 45 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Robin Rogers. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 44 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Keeva Pierce. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 43 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Fermine Perez. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 42 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephanie Lynch. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 41 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeanine Lopez. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Bryan Jones. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 39 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Lynn Frank. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 38 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Department of Health and Human Services. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 37 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jennifer Cullivan. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 36 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 35 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Laura Coulthard. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 34 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Wendy Christian. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 33 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Child Protective Services. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 21, 2011 Filing 32 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Veronica Carillo. Attorney O'Dea, Mark Peter added.(O'Dea, Mark)
July 1, 2011 Filing 31 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Child Protective Services, Wendy Christian, Department of Health and Human Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert R. Powell* *925 West Hedding Street* *San Jose, CA 95126*. (Michel, G)
July 1, 2011 Filing 30 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Edward Olvera, Susan Morrison. (Michel, G)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 06/30/11 GRANTING leave to file Second Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
July 1, 2011 PARTY UPDATE: Department of Health and Human Services, Child Protective Services and Wendy Christian added. (Michel, G)
June 30, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint) (Powell, Robert) Modified on 7/1/2011 (Marciel, M)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/25/2011 ORDERING that there will be no limit on the number of depositions that each side may take, without waiving any party's right to object to a deposition as provided by the FRCP. The currently scheduled two separate phases of non-expert discovery are combined to allow discovery as to both liability and Monell issues to proceed concurrently, with all non-expert discovery to be completed by 10/1/2011. Expert witness discovery shall proceed as follows: Pltfs' Expert Disclosure: 8/1/2011; Dfts' Expert Disclosure: 8/25/2011; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure:9/21/2011; Expert Discovery Cut Off: 11/11/2011. All other dates remain as set forth in the court's prior scheduling orders. (Zignago, K.)
April 21, 2011 Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue Discovery Cut-Off Dates by Edward Olvera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Powell, Robert) Modified on 4/22/2011 (Duong, D).
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller to the position of District Judge, this action is temporarily assigned to *Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows*. (Benson, A.)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/30/2010 #23 Initial Discovery due by 5/29/2011; Phase II Discovery due by 10/1/2011; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/15/2011; Pltfs' Pretrial Statement due by 2/3/2012, Dfts' Pretrial Statement due by 2/10/2012; Trial reset for 3/20/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; Pretrial Conference reset for 2/21/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
November 24, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for Modification of Scheduling Order #20 . Attorney Lindsey-Doyle, Amy Brie'Ann added. (Lindsey-Doyle, Amy) Modified on 11/29/2010 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER re discovery and protection of documents and discovery re minor plaintiffs signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/10. (Kaminski, H)
September 23, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re DISCOVERY by defendants . (Pappone, Jeri) Modified on 9/24/2010 (Kaminski, H).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/2/10: Discovery due by 8/31/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/15/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 12/20/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
July 21, 2010 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Carla De Rose, Kelly Meis, Susan Morrison, Edward Olvera. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 7/23/2010 (Carlos, K).
July 9, 2010 Filing 18 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Stephanie Lynch. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeanine Lopez. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 16 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jennifer Cullivan. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 15 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Lynn Frank. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 14 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by County of Sacramento. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 13 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Laura Coulthard. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Robin Rogers. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 11 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Keeva Pierce. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 10 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Fermine Perez. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 9 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Veronica Carillo. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
July 9, 2010 Filing 8 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Solla. Attorney Pappone, Jeri Lynn added.(Pappone, Jeri)
April 28, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Laura Coulthard* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Ross Powell* *Law Offices of Robert R. Powell* *925 West Hedding Street* *San Jose, CA 95126*. (Kaminski, H)
April 27, 2010 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Edward Olvera.(Powell, Robert)
March 8, 2010 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jeanine Lopez, Fermine Perez, Jennifer Cullivan, Bryan Jones, Robin Rogers, Keeva Pierce, Veronica Carillo, Stephanie Lynch, Lynn Frank, Solla, County of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Ross Powell* *Law Offices of Robert R. Powell* *925 West Hedding Street* *San Jose, CA 95126*. (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2010 RECEIPT number #CAE200024403 $350.00 fbo Edward Olvera by Robert R. Powell| on 3/8/2010. (Kaminski, H)
March 5, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Edward Olvera (Ingols, Dennis)
March 4, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Edward Olvera. Attorney Powell, Robert Ross added. (Powell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olvera v County of Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AND-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla De Rose
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Meis
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Morrison
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Olvera
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Represented By: Dennis Raymond Ingols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SD-O
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett O. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Carillo
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Protective Services
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Christian
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Coulthard
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cullivan
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred DeMartin
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Edison
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fera
Represented By: Cathleen Janel Fralick
Represented By: Carol A Wieckowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Frank
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Gilbert-Driggs
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Guillone
Represented By: Cathleen Janel Fralick
Represented By: Carol A Wieckowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Jones
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Lake
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Lee
Represented By: Cathleen Janel Fralick
Represented By: Carol A Wieckowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine Lopez
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lynch
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Pearson
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fermine Perez
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeva Pierce
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Rogers
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Schrage
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solla
Represented By: Mark Peter O'Dea
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Travis
Represented By: Cathleen Janel Fralick
Represented By: Carol A Wieckowski
Represented By: Daniel P Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?