June 18, 2013 |
Filing
108
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/18/13; GRANTING 105 Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Costs and DENYING defendants' Application for Costs; and so that he has a copy for his records, notwithstanding the fact that the costs are no l onger being taxed, the Clerk of Court is requested to serve on plaintiff a copy of 101 bill of costs originally filed on 11/13/12. (Meuleman, A)
|
July 10, 2012 |
Filing
93
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/10/12 ordering that plaintiff will be provided 21 days to file additional evidentiary submissions if he wishes, but is not required. No extensions will be given. (Plummer, M)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/02/12 ordering the undersigned will take no action on serving Petersen until the pending findings and recommendations are adopted or declined. (Plummer, M)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
90
ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 69 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/31/12. The Clerk is directed to send pltf 1 USM form and a copy of the 5/11/10 amended complaint. Submission of documents due within 60 days. (Manzer, C)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
88
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/9/2012 ORDERING that defendants' 80 motion for an extension is GRANTED and the motion for summary judgment is DEEMED TIMELY FILED; and RECOMMENDING that unserved defendant Peterson should be dismissed from this action; and defendants' 77 , 81 motions for summary judgment be granted in their entirety and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
February 14, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/13/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 82 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an opposition. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within seven days thereafter. (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/24/2011 DENYING pltf's 66 motion to compel. (Yin, K)
|
October 18, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/17/2011 ADOPTING 59 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Michel, G)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/21/11 ordering approximately 13 defendants answered the complaint and a discovery and scheduling order was issued on 04/28/11. Two other defendants, Baptista and Barham answered the complaint on 05/23/11. It is not clear if plaintiff and defendants Baptista and Barham commenced discovery. Therefor the 04/28/11 discovery order 49 shall apply to plaintiff and Baptista and Barham except that: ( Discovery due by 10/24/2011, All Pretrial Motions, except motions to compel discovery shall be filed on or before 12/16/2011.)(Plummer, M)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
69
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/22/11 recommending that defendant Peterson be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 2, 2011 |
Filing
59
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/2/2011 RECOMMENDING that pltf's 38 motion for preliminary injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/22/2011 ORDERING that Dfts are to file a reply to Pltf's 38 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction within 21 days. The Clerk to send a copy of the 16 amended complaint, a copy of 38 motion and a copy of this order upon Monica Anderson, Supervising Attorney General and Warden William Knipp. (cc: M. Anderson) (Zignago, K.)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/2011 ADOPTING 21 Findings and Recommendations in full. Dft Vallery, any ADA claim and any claims regarding the treatment of inmate Mayfield are DISMISSED from this action. (Zignago, K.)
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/15/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 29 motion to vacate is GRANTED and the 25 motion is VACATED. (Yin, K)
|
December 30, 2010 |
Filing
21
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/29/10 recommending that defendant Vallery, any ADA claims and any claims regarding the treatment of inmate Mayfield be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/1/10 DENYING 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/30/10 ORERING that the claims of Pltfs Michael Mayfield; Troy Rackley; Roy Fairwell and Terry Lefavour are severed from the claims of Pltf Birdwell; Plft shall proceed as the sole Pltf in case no. 2:10-cv-719 FCD GGH (PC); Clerk directed to open 4 separate civil actions for Pltfs Mayfield, Lefavour, Fairwell and Rackley; action to be assigned to the district judge and magistrate judge whom the instant case is assigned; instant case complai nt to be docketed in each case and to reflect only the names of the Pltfs proceeding in that particular action; Clerk directed to send new IFP application to each of the 4 proceeding Pltfs; each Plft, except for Pltf Birdwell, is granted 30 days to file a new IFP application bearing the new case number assigned to them. (Owen, K)
|