Capitol Waste, Inc. v. A Greener Globe, et al.,
Plaintiff: Capitol Waste, Inc.
Defendant: A Greener Globe, Daniel G. Sheehan, Jacklyn C. Sheehan, Western Highland Mortgage Fund 1, LLC, United States of America, Department of Treasury-IRS and Northern California Collection Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00866
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER 39 for DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/22/2013. Pursuant to 37 Stipulation and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice against all defendants. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Marciel, M)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER setting Settlement Conference on 12/10/2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Newman. (Deutsch, S)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/24/12 ORDERING that the 5/13/13 Jury Trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. The parties shal file trial briefs not later than 11/21/2013. The 3/21/13 Final Pretrial Conference is V ACATED and CONTINUED to 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 11/14/13. Any Evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 11/14/13. Oppositions must be filed by 11/21/2013 and any reply must be filed by 11/28/2013. All other dates set forth in the Court's Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order are confirmed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/14/11 ORDERING the United States' motion for summary judgment 14 is GRANTED. The United States has an interest in all property and property rights of plaintiff by virtue of its federal tax liens against plaintiff, and any proceeds due to plaintiff from a partition of the long-term lease at issue should be distributed to the United States for application to plaintiff's unpaid federal tax liabilities. (Becknal, R)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 3\11/11: HEARING as to 14 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONTINUED to 4/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. Plaintiff' s counsel is ordered to show cause why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $150.00 for failing to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to defendant's motion. Plaintiff's counsel shall file his response to the Order to Show Cause on or before March 25, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/28/10. Discovery due by 2/28/2011. (Kaminski, H)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/28/10 ORDERING that the discovery cutoff is EXTENDED to 12/31/10. (Benson, A.)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ) ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/12/10: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/15/2010. Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/25/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Waste, Inc. v. A Greener Globe, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Waste, Inc.
Represented By: Robbin Van Herr Waarde Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Greener Globe
Represented By: James R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Sheehan
Represented By: James R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacklyn C. Sheehan
Represented By: James R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Highland Mortgage Fund 1, LLC
Represented By: James R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Treasury-IRS
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Collection Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?