Jacobs v. Reed, et al.,

Plaintiff: Thomas Jacobs
Defendant: Chuck Reed, City of San Jose, County of Santa Clara, Rob Davis, Laurie Smith and Edmund G. Brown
Case Number: 2:2010cv00913
Filed: April 16, 2010
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/11/16 ORDERING that all proceedings are STAYED in this matter pending a final resolution of the appeals in Peruta v. County of San Diego. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that time is enlarged for def endants to file responsive pleadings or motions to 30 days after the stay is lifted. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that all parties retain the right to bring a motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) to transfer this action for the convenience of the parties. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are obligated to notify this Court of the final resolution of Peruta v. County of San Diego within five working days after the Ninth Circuit's mandate issues in each case.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Status Conference and/or continued stay of proceedings signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/16/15. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that time is enlarged for defendants to file responsive pleadings or motions 30 days after the stay is lifted. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 9, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/9/10. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 20, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/20/10 GRANTING 7 Ex Parte Application to redact exhibits in 1 Complaint. (Donati, J) Modified on 5/20/2010 (Donati, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Reed, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jacobs
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?