M. et al v. Drycreek Joint Elemtnary School District et al
Plaintiff: Grayson M., Kevin R Marchese and Lyndi Marchese
Defendant: Drycreek Joint Elemtnary School District, California Department of Education and Jack O'Connell
Case Number: 2:2010cv00944
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 11/6/13 ORDERING that defendant's request to tax costs is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/7/12 ORDERING that the ALJ's Decision is AFFIRMED, and District's 65 summary judgment motion is GRANTED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/10/12 GRANTING defendant's request re 78 Memorandum filed by Drycreek Joint Elementary School District to file its reply to plaintiff's late opposition. Defendant has 7 days from the date on which this order is filed to file its reply brief. Further, 65 motion for summary judgment will be decided without oral argument and the hearing scheduled for 4/16/12 is VACATED. (Meuleman, A)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/13/2011 ORDERING that in light of the present record, it has not been shown that the objection should be sustained. Therefore the objection is OVERRULED. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/26/11 ORDERING the status conference set for 1/31/11 is VACATED; Discovery due by 2/16/2012; Trial set for 9/11/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr..; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr..; the last hearing date for motions shall be 4/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Carlos, K)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 01/04/11 ORDERING that plf's 39 Motion to permit a Non-party to file Amicus Points and Authorities is DENIED as moot. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/30/10 ORDERING dfts CDE and O'Connell's 17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; pltfs' claims against these dfts under § 1983 are DISMISSED with prejudice since amendment would be futile, and plaintiffs claims against Defendants under § 504 and the IDEA are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, since plaintiffs failed to exhaust their administrative remedies. (Carlos, K)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/09/10 re 27 MOTION REGARDING STAY PUT; ORDERING the stay-put provision in 20 U.S.C.§ 1415(j) does not require the District to use Coutchies reading instruction services. (Williams, D)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/4/2010 ORDERING Ms. Porter is not a party and does not have leave of court to file documents in this case, or to otherwise attempt to communicate with the judge about the case. Leave has to be duly sought and granted before a non party is authorized to file a document or otherwise communicate with the judge. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court shall return the enclosed correspondence to Ms. Porter.(Matson, R)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/30/10 ORDERING Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel is Ordered to Show Cause ("OSC") in a writing to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on October 18, 2010, why sanctions should not be imposed against Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's counsel for failure to file a timely status report. If a hearing is requested on the OSC, it will be held on November 1, at 9:00 a.m., just prior to the status conference, which is rescheduled to that date. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen days prior to the status conference. (Becknal, R)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/19/10 ORDERING that Kevin and Lyndi Marchese are apponted as Guardina as Litem for G.M. the Clerk of Court shall use the initials G.M. for the minor on the civil docket and shall discontinue using the minor's first name. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/6/10: Kevin Marchese shall clarify in a filing whether he is the attorney of record for plaintiff G.M. If Kevin Marchese is not G.M.'s attorney, then movants shall explain why G.M. should not be dismissed as a plaintiff from this case since he is not represented by counsel. This filing is due no later than May 20, 2010. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. et al v. Drycreek Joint Elemtnary School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grayson M.
Represented By: Kevin R. Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Marchese
Represented By: Kevin R. Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndi Marchese
Represented By: Kevin R. Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drycreek Joint Elemtnary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?