Johnson v. Cottage Bell Investors
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Cottage Bell Investors
Case Number: 2:2010cv00994
Filed: April 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/25/2010 ORDERING 11 that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 9/30/2010. (Reader, L)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 7/7/2010 ORDERING 9 dispositional documents are to be filed on or before 8/9/2010. All dates/hearings set in this matter, to include any pending motions, are hereby VACATED. (Reader, L)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 6/21/10 ORDERING that Deft's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/6/10. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cottage Bell Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Bell Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?