Harris v. High Desert State Prison et al

Petitioner: Lee Edward Harris
Respondent: High Desert State Prison, Government Claims Program and Jacqueline B. Tinetti
Case Number: 2:2010cv01015
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/06/10. The Court will issue no response to future filings by Petitioner in this action not authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/14/2010 ORDERING that ptnr's 13 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED; and the clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge; and RECOMMENDING that ptnr's application for hc be dismissed w/out prejudice, and the clerk be directed to serve a copy of any order adopting these F&R, w/ the 7/29/10 amended petition on Michael Farrell. Assigned and Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/20/2010 ORDERING that ptnr's 6 , 9 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; ptnr has 30 days to file an amended petition; ptnr's failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the clerk to send ptnr a habeas corpus form. (Yin, K)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/2010 ORDERING petitioner to submit, w/in 30 days, either the filing fee or an ifp application; the clerk to send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. High Desert State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee Edward Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Government Claims Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jacqueline B. Tinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?