Aldridge v. Garcia
Plaintiff: Ernest Aldridge
Defendant: J Garcia
Case Number: 2:2010cv01045
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/4/11 ORDERING the findings and recommnedations 9 filed 916/10 are VACATED; the findings and recommendations filed 11/10/10 are ADOPTED IN FULL; dft's motion to dismiss 5 is GRANTED; pltf's motion for summary judgment 7 is DENIED AS MOOT; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/09/10 RECOMMENDING that dft's 5 Motion to Dismiss be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to these F&Rs due w/i 14 days; referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell. (Benson, A.)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/15/10 Recommending that this Action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with Court Rules and Orders. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written Objections with the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER submitting 5 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/22/10. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?