Wilson v. Allied-Barton Security Services
Plaintiff: Manuel Wilson
Defendant: Allied-Barton Security Services
Case Number: 2:2010cv01156
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds ORDERING that the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for 5/5/2011 is VACATED; recommending that 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Allied-Barton Security Services be granted; and that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Matter referred to District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections to these findings and recommendations may be filed w/i 14 days after being served. (Waggoner, D)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING SERVE by US MARSHAL WITHOUT PRE-PAYMENT of COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/15/2010. Clerk directed to forward following documents: issued Summons, 2 copies of Complaint, Civil New Case Documents, and 2 copies of service order. (Marciel, M)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/8/10 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court to send pltf 1 USM-285 form, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 5/11/10; and within 60 days from the date of this order, pltf shall submit the completed documents along the attached Notice of Submission of Documents to the Clerk's Office. (Carlos, K)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US MARSHALL W/OUT PRE-PAYMENT of COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/14/2010. Documents sent to USMS: 1 issued Summons, 1 USM-285 form, 2 copies of 5/11/2010 Complaint, and 2 copies of service process order. (Marciel, M) Modified on 6/15/2010 (Marciel, M).
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/18/10 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; the Court shall send plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, 1 summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 5/11/10; W/i 30 days, plaintiff shall submit following: 1 completed summons; 1 completed USM-285 form; and 2 copies of the endorsed complaint. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Allied-Barton Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Barton Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?