KZSA Broadcasting, Inc v. Immaculate Heart Radio Educational Broadcasting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KZSA Broadcasting, Inc and Diamond Broadcasting
Defendant: Immaculate Heart Radio Educational Broadcasting, Inc. and Douglas M. Daggs
Case Number: 2:2010cv01213
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/16/11 ORDERING this action DISMISSED with prejudice as to dfts Douglas M. Daggs, as Trustee for the Dellar Family Trust and Douglas M. Daggs, Successor Trustee of the Sylvia Dellar Survivor's Trust ONLY. (Carlos, K)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/17/10 DENYING dfts' 43 and 47 Motions to Dismiss. (Manzer, C)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/20/10 ORDERING the Defendant's motion to strike is granted and denied in part, and Defendant's alternative dismissal motion is denied. Plaintiffs are granted fourteen (14) days from the date on which this order is filed to file a Second Amended Complaint to add Douglas M. Daggs, Successor Trustee to the Sylvia Dellar Survivor's Trust as a defendant. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/13/2010 ORDERING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/20/2010 is continued to 1/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Matson, R)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 08/31/10 DENYING 12 and 13 Motions to Dismiss ; DENYING 22 Motion to Strike; Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date on which this Order is filed. (Williams, D)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/20/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Ex Parte TRO Application 8 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KZSA Broadcasting, Inc v. Immaculate Heart Radio Educational Broadcasting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KZSA Broadcasting, Inc
Represented By: Sandra Raye Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Broadcasting
Represented By: Sandra Raye Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immaculate Heart Radio Educational Broadcasting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas M. Daggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?