Rodriquez v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Nahu Rodriquez
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 2:2010cv01226
Filed: May 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 2/9/12; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Any further request for a Certificate of Appealability must be addressed to the Court of Appeals. The Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED.(Matson, R)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/18/2011 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 are ADOPTED in FULL; Respondent's 11 motion to dismiss is DENIED; and respondent shall file an answer to petitioner's habeas petition within 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/2011 recommending that respondent's 8/23/10 11 motion to dismiss be denied. Respondent shall file an answer to petitioner's habeas petition within sixty days from the date of any order adopting the instant findings and recommendations. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriquez v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nahu Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?