Lessard, et al v. Trinity Protection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael P. Lessard and Robert L. Reagan
Defendant: Trinity Protection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01262
Filed: May 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/17/11 ORDERING that (1) the settlement of the claims of the named Plaintiffs in this action is approved and the named Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED in theirentirety with prejudice; (2) any other claims in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice; (3) based on the representations of the parties, none of the monetary portion of the settlement consideration is allocated to the civil penalties alleged in this action; (4) the Co urt shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement; and (5) this action shall be DISMISSED in its entirety, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the confidential Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/17/11 DENYING the 35 and the 58 Motions to Compel as moot; plaintiffs request for the award of reasonable expenses is granted with respect to its motion to compel responses; plaintiffs requ est for an award of reasonable expenses or sanctions in connection with their motion to compel further answers to plaintiffs first set of request for admissions is denied; defendants request for the award of reasonable expenses and/or sanctions is denied. (Michel, G)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/11: Attorney S. Ward Heinrichs, may appear telephonically at Motion Hearing to Compel Discovery set for June 16, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25. (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/8/11: HEARING as to 58 MOTION to COMPEL, 35 MOTION to COMPEL continued to 6/16/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kaminski, H)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/6/11: The jury trial is hereby CONT'D to 7/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Related deadlines will be calculated with reference to the new trial date and a comprehensive Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order will be forthcoming accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/11: The Settlement Conference is SET for 3/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties shall submit their settlement conf statements BY 3/24/11. (Kastilahn, A)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/02/10 ORDERING Pursuant to Local Rule 16-271, the parties hereby agree to submit the above entitled action to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program.(Williams, D)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/30/2010 re 30 ORDERING that Case Referred to VDRP. (cc: LM) (Duong, D)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/2/10 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 7 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/19/10 ORDERING dft's moiton for a protective order 9 is DENIED; the parties' respective requests for fees and costs are also DENIED. (Carlos, K)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/2010 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' attorney, S. Ward Heinrichs, may appear telephonically at Defendant's Hearing on Motion for Protective Order set for July 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (Duong, D)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/12/10 for dft's Rule 12(b) motion set for 7/22/10 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7. (Carlos, K) Modified on 7/13/2010 (Carlos, K).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lessard, et al v. Trinity Protection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Lessard
Represented By: S. Ward Heinrichs, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Reagan
Represented By: S. Ward Heinrichs, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Protection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?