Dean v. Maness
Plaintiff: Alton E. Dean
Defendant: Erik Maness
Case Number: 2:2010cv01265
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/2010 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice. Assigned and Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/29/10 denying 7 Motion to Proceed IFP; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee for this action.(Dillon, M)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/1/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Maness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton E. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Maness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?