Strack v. Board of Prison Hearings
Petitioner: Kevin Strack
Respondent: Board of Prison Hearings
Case Number: 2:2010cv01311
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/14/11 recommending that respondents' 08/16/10 motion to dismiss the pending petition due to the lack of habeas jurisdiction over the action 10 be granted; and this action be dismissed. MOTION to DISMISS 10 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/10 denying without prejudice 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Dillon, M)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/14/2010. Respondents are directed to file a response to petitioner's habeas petition w/i 60 days from date of this order. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, the petition, and the court's consent forms on Jennifer A. Neill, DAG. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strack v. Board of Prison Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Strack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Prison Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?