Haney v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Monte Haney
Defendant: M.P. Hernandez, D. J. Ruiz, R. Bottello, M. Rickman, F. Oliver, G. Torres, T. Cano, J. Jones and L. Cano
Case Number: 2:2010cv01324
Filed: May 20, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:10-cv-1324 JAM DAD PC) to Fresno (1:10-cv-2134 SKO PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/15/2010; this court has not ruled on pltf's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/10 ORDERING that w/in 30 days, pltf to file a new ifp application; and the clerk to provide pltf w/ the ifp application.(Yin, K)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/23/2010 GRANTING pltf 30 days to file a completed ifp application; the clerk to provide pltf w/ an ifp application.(Yin, K)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/4/10 ORDERING that Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with another copy of the in forma pauperis application used by this court; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed in forma pauperis application. (Dillon, M)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/27/2010. New Case Number 2:10-cv-01324-DAD (PC). Old Case Number 1:10-cv-00903-MJS (PC). (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.P. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bottello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?