Bank of America Corporation v. U.S. Loan Auditors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America Corporation
Defendant: U.S. Loan Auditors, LLC, Shane Barker and James Sandison
Case Number: 2:2010cv01329
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT and ORDER and signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/2/10: The Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction is GRANTED. Judgment is entered against Defendants and in favor of Plaintiff. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs in connection with this action. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action for all purposes. (Kaminski, H)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/7/2010 DENYING 23 Motion to Strike and 22 Motion for Judgment On the Pleadings. (Matson, R)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 08/11/10 GRANTING 7 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Williams, D)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER 14 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/2010 ORDERING the Court hereby extends the time in which the defendants may file their respective initial pleadings in response to the complaint to July 30, 2010. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America Corporation v. U.S. Loan Auditors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Mark D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Loan Auditors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sandison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?