Pena v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Ignacio Pena
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 2:2010cv01336
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 8/15/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed; Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/08/11 ordering that petitioner has 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss or statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/9/10 ORDERING that within 21 days from the date of this order, petitioner shall submit the appropriate filing fee. (Dillon, M)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/10/10 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district; and petitioners 1 request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ignacio Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?