Pico v. Consumnes River College et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Pico
Defendant: Consumnes River College and Robert Montanez
Case Number: 2:2010cv01406
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/7/11: HEARING as to 36 MOTION for attorney fees RESET for 4/20/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/11 ORDERING the hearing on Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees is continued to February 9, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #6. (Becknal, R)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/21/10 GRANTING with prejudice 8 Motion to Dismiss. (Williams, D)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/18/10, ORDERING that a joint statement is DUE by 11/11/10 as to dft's 28 discovery motion. (Kastilahn, A)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/16/2010 DENYING 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pico v. Consumnes River College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Pico
Represented By: James Joseph Lynch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumnes River College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?