Rhodes v. The Sacramento Police Department
Petitioner: Andre Rhodes
Respondent: The Sacramento Police Department
Case Number: 2:2010cv01444
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/17/2011 DENYING ptnr's 42 motion for reconsideration. (Yin, K)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/13/11 DENYING 38 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Michel, G)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/23/2011 ORDERING that 15 motion to dismiss is GRANTED; the 6 amended petition is DISMISSED for failure to exhaust state remedies; ptnr's 30 motion for final judgment is DENIED as moot; ptnr's 31 motion and request for clarification is DENIED as moot; and the clerk shall close this action. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/31/2011 DENYING ptnr's 28 motion for relief from judgment. (Yin, K)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/2010 DENYING 25 Petitioner's motion for order of adaptation due to clerical error. (Reader, L)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/27/10 ORDERING that petitioners 19 motion to place matter on calendar is DENIED; Petitioners 20 motion for evidentiary hearing and oral argument is DENIED; and Petitioners 21 motion for federal indictments is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/30/10 denying 13 Motion for federal protective custody. (Dillon, M)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/21/2010 ORDERING the clerk to substitute HDSP Warden, Mike McDonald in place of Sacramento PD as the respondent; ptnr to submit, w/in 28 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; the petition is DISMISSED w/ leave to amend, w/in 28 days; the clerk to send ptnr an ifp form and a 2254 form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. The Sacramento Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Sacramento Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?