Saenz-Payne v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Saenz-Payne
Defendant: State of California and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2010cv01455
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/28/11 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the 43 Settlement Agreement and Order. All disputes over enforcement of 43 Settlement Agreement and Order shall be heard and resolved by Magistrate Judge Drozd as agreed by the parties. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/11 ORDERING that this Order shall be a full, complete, and final disposition and settlement of Pltf's claims against Dfts. The parties agree that there has been no a dmission or finding of liability for any claim in this Action, and this Settlement Agreement and Order shall not be construed as such; the parties agree and stipulate that the agreed-upon modifications will be performed in compliance with the standar ds and specifications for disabled access as set forth in the CA Code of Reg., Title 24-2, and the ADA Accessibility Guidelines, unless other standards are specifically agreed to in this Settlement Agreement and Order. The parties have reached an agr eement as to pltf's damages, atty fees, litigation expenses and costs. Dfts shall pay $96,300 as full and final resolution of Pltf's claims for all statutory, actual, and PI damages, including, but not limited to, general, compensatory, and special damages, atty fees, litigation expenses and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER 24 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/15/2011. Parties may have up to and including 6/24/2011 to file Stipulation for Dismissal and Settlement Agreement. (Marciel, M)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/18/2011 GRANTING the parties stipulation and SETS a Settlement Conference on Thursday, May 5, 2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Settlement Conference Statements are due one week before the conference and should be emailed to dadorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Krueger, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saenz-Payne v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Saenz-Payne
Represented By: Celia L. McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?