Mathias v. Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Mathias
Defendant: Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01476
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/26/11 ORDERING the Court having considered Plaintiff Ryan Mathias' ("Mathias") and Defendant Rent-A-Center, Inc.'s ("RAC") joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice, good cause appearing, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, Plaintiff's action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Becknal, R)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/12/11 ORDERING that all proceedings in this case are STAYED. The status conference set for 5/16/11 is VACATED. The clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE this case. Plaintiff shall inform the court to reopen this case within 14 days of a final decision on defendant's appeal. CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. (Donati, J)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/18/2011 ORDERING that a further status conference is set for May 16, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. Updated status reports shall be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference.(Duong, D)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/9/10. This case is stayed pending resolution of dft's motion to stay before the 9th Circuit. The parties shall inform the Court of the 9th Circuit's decision within 7 days of the decision. (Manzer, C)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/27/10 DENYING Deft's 23 Motion to Stay pending appeal; case STAYED for a period of 14 days so that Deft may seek a stay from the Court of Appeals. (Owen, K)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/15/2010 DENYING dft's 5 motion to compel arbitration. (Zignago, K.)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/16/2010 ORDERING due to court congestion, the court CONTINUES the hearing set for 7/26/2010 re 5 Motion to Compel until Monday, August 30, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton This order does not extend the deadline for defendants' reply memorandum, which shall be filed according to the initial hearing date. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathias v. Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Mathias
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?