Burris v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Burris
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv01561
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/11/11 GRANTING 27 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 01/04/11 GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from the date on which this order is filed to file an amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies in her Complaint. (Williams, D)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/2/10: Counsel for each party was issued an OSC 18 on November 10, 2010 for failing to file a status report, to which each counsel responded. Although the responses reveal each counsel could be sanctioned, the judge will not impose a sanction this time. (Kaminski, H)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/9/10 ORDERING parties to SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING no later than 4:00 PM on 11/19/10 why sanctions should not be imposed against them/or their counsel for failure to file a timely status report; status conference reset for 9:00 AM on 12/13/10 in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Burris
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?