Barron v. Martel et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie E. Barron
Defendant: M. Martel, Smith, Galloway, Naseer, K. Todd, K. Martinez and Stanford
Case Number: 2:2010cv01567
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 [WITHDRAWN pursuant to 141 Minute Order] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/9/2017 ORDERING within 20 days, counsel for defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's 8/7/2017 notice 138 .(Yin, K) Modified on 8/10/2017 (Donati, J).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/12/2017 ORDERING this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii); each party to bear its own costs, and attorney's fees and expenses.(Reader, L)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SECOND AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/21/17 ORDERING the previous Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 130 is hereby vacated. The Custodian to produce Ronnie E. B arron via teleconference on 3/29/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: KJN) (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/7/16 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 3/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall mail his non-confidential settlement statement to arrive not less than seven days prior to the settlement conference, addressed to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kastilahn, A)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/5/16 ORDERING that within 14 calendar days from the date of this Order, the parties are directed to contact Sujean Park, ADR and Pro Bono Direc tor, for the scheduling of a Settlement Conference. The parties shall file, not later than 5/15/17, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference statement. The parties shall file Trial Briefs not later than 5/15/17. Any evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 5/15/17. Oppositions must be filed by 5/29/17, and any reply must be filed by 6/12/17. A Jury Trial is set on 6/26/17, at 9:00 a.m., in courtroom 7. (Kastilahn, A)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/1/16 ORDERING Within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date of this Order, the parties are directed to contact Sujean Park, ADR and Pro Bono Director, for the scheduling of a Settlement Conference. The parties shall file, not later than 5/15/17, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference statement. The parties shall file Trial Briefs not later than 5/15/17. Any evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 5/15/17. Oppositions must be filed by 5/29/17, and any reply must be filed by 6/12/17. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. A Jury Trial is set on 6/26/17, at 9:00 a.m., in courtroom 7. (Becknal, R)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/22/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 119 120 Objections are DENIED. (Benson, A)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/20/16 ordering that plaintiff's "objections" 117 filed here on 10/17/16 is denied. (Plummer, M)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 09/30/16 granting 104 Motion for Extension of time. The deadline to serve expert witness disclosures is continued to October 30, 2016. The deadline to serve rebuttal expert witness disclosures i s continued to November 30, 2016. The deadline to complete all expert discovery, including depositions of expert witnesses, is extended to December 31, 2016. Plaintiffs May 31, 2016 Motion for Production of Documents 107 is denied. Plaintiffs September 23, 2016 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum 114 is denied. (Plummer, M)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/27/16: Senior Judge William B. Shubb recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:10-cv-01567 MCE EFB. (Kaminski, H)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/16 ordering the motion to withdraw counsel 92 is granted. The motion to remove an inadvertently filed document 94 is denied. (Plummer, M)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/5/16. The deadline to serve expert witness disclosures shall be extended from May 13, 2016 to May 27, 2016. The deadline to serve rebuttal expert witness disclosures shall be extended from June 13, 2016 to June 20, 2016. The deadline to complete all expert discovery, including depositions of expert witnesses, shall be extended from July 29, 2016 to August 5, 2016. (Dillon, M)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/21/16 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Ronnie Barron via video conferencing at 10:00 am on 5/18/16 in before Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept)(Dillon, M)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/13/16 ORDERING that deadline to serve expert witness disclosures is EXTENDED to 5/13/2016. The deadline to serve rebuttal expert witness disclosures is EXTENDED to 6/13/2016. The deadline to complete all expert discovery, including depositions of expert witnesses, is EXTENDED to 7/29/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding admissibility of medical records signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/22/16. (Benson, A)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/29/15 ordering (Discovery due by 2/16/2016 Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/15/2016.) The parties shall disclose any rebuttal expert witnesses on or before 6/01/16. The parties shall complete expert depositions on or before 7/01/16. The final pretrial conference (8/15/16) and trial (9/13/16) before the United States District Judge William B. Shubb remain uneffected. (Plummer, M)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER 77 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/8/2015 continuing the Final Pretrial Conference to 8/15/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Bench Trial is continued to 9/13/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/1/2015 Re 75 Plaintiff's Request to Continue Trial Date and Re-Open Discovery: Court orders plaintiff's request for additional limited discovery REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge. The court will defer ruling upon plaintiff's motion to continue the final pretrial conference and trial date pending the magistrate judge's ruling on the request for additional discovery. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/27/15: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Trial set for 8/11/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/23/15 ordering Andrew L. Chang, Alicia J. Donahue and Amir M. Nassihi are appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Andrew L. Chang, Alicia J. Donahue and Amir M. Nassihi, Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP, 1 Montgomery St., Ste 2700, San Francisco, CA 94104. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/26/14 ordering the Custodian to produce Ronnie E. Barron via videoconferencing at 12/11/14 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento)(Plummer, M)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2014 ORDERING that within 21 days, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge or if they wish to be referred to the court's mediation program in accordance with this order; and the Clerk shall send each party the consent form for settlement conferences.(Yin, K)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/29/2014 ADOPTING IN FULL 57 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; REFERRING this action back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further pretrial proceedings. (Michel, G)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/8/2014 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 47 motion for summary judgment be denied; and this action be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for futher pretrial proceedings. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/29/14 denying 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting in part 51 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order in which to file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed and served in accordance with Locarl Rule 230(l). The court's 04/02/14 order to show cause is discharged. (Plummer, M)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/2/2014. Within 14 days of date of Order, plaintiff shall file an Opposition, if any, to defendants' 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Failure to file an Opposition will be deemed as a Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion and shall result in a recommendation that action be dismissed pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Alternatively, if plaintiff no longer wishes to pursue this action, he may file a request to voluntarily dismiss this case. (Marciel, M)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/06/14 granting 45 Motion to modify scheduling order adn to reset the pending deadline for filing dispositive motions. The parties shall file any dispositive motions on or before 02/21/14. Except as stated in this order, the court's 07/23/13 discovery and scheduling order remains in effect. (Plummer, M)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/25/13. (Plummer, M)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/17/13 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendants motion to dismiss. (Dillon, M)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/7/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 15 amended cmplt is DISMISSED; pltf has 30 days to file a second amended cmplt; and the clerk to send pltf a form for filing a civil rights action. (Yin, K)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronnie E. Barron signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/01/10. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/29/10 denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Martel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie E. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naseer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?