Morris v. California Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jason A. Morris
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, Kathleen L Dickinson and Vimal Singh
Case Number: 2:2010cv01576
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/12 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; All pending motions, including plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to comply with the courts order granting his motion to proceed in forma pauperis 15 are DENIED as moot; and this action is CLOSED.(Dillon, M)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jason A. Morris signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/10 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed ifp application; and the clerk to send ptlf an ifp application.(Yin, K)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/21/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010) [Transferred from cand on 6/23/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen L Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimal Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?