Miller v. Stowell et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Defendant: B. Stowell, B. Goodnight and S. Sader
Case Number: 2:2010cv01605
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/13/2010 ORDERING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. CASE CLOSED.(Matson, R)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 8/11/2010. Upon reconsideration, Magistrate Judge Drodz's 7/8/2010 3 Order is AFFIRMED. Within 15 days from service of this Order, plaintiff shall pay $350 filing fee. Failure to pay fee will result in dismissal of this action. (Marciel, M)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/7/10 ORDERING that plaintiff is found ineligible to proceed in forma pauperis in this action; and within 30 days from the service of this order, plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Stowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?