Abreu v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Abreu
Defendant: Matthew L. Cate, Richard Subia, Michael Martel, Lonnie Jackson, Christopher Smith, Brett Williams, Karen McLean, Kelly Martinez, Miranda, Robinson and Davis
Case Number: 2:2010cv01621
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/12/15 ordering that based on the declaration filed by Mr. Smith, the court finds that no further action is necessary, and plaintiff's request to vacate the settlement agreement is denied. (Plummer, M)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/14: This action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. (Kaminski, H)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/12/14 ORDERING that defendant C. Smith is DISMISSED, with prejudice, from this action. (Dillon, M)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/25/14 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Clifford Abreu at 9:00 am in Courtroom 25 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/4/13 ADOPTING in full 61 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file his pretrial statement within 30 days. Plaintiff's failure to file a pretrial statement within 30 days will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. All remaining defendants shall file their pretrial statement of statements within 21 days of service of plaintiff's. (Meuleman, A)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/1/2013 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 54 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/02/13 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a supplemental opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment not to exceede 15 pages in length in which plaintiff shall respond directly to defendants' statement of undisputed facts in the manner discussed herein. Defendants may file a response within 14 days after service with plaintiff's supplemental opposition. (Plummer, M)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/17/12 ORDERING that plaintiff will be provided 21 days to file additional evidentiary materials regarding defendants motion for summary judgment, but it is not required. No extensions will be given. (Dillon, M)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/17/2012 ORDERING that defendants have 7 days in which to SHOW CAUSE why the motion to compel should not be granted. (Yin, K)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/11/2012 ORDERING that within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the 34 motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Yin, K)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 8/15/11; Defendants have until 9/1/11 to respond to Plaintiff's request for Interrogatories and Documents, and Plaintiff's Request for Admissions. (Matson, R)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Clifford Abreu signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/19/2010. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/09/10 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the cler k of the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abreu v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Subia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?