Low v. City of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Monte L. Low
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2010cv01624
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/15/11 RECOMMENDING that 18 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Strike filed by Scott LaCosse, City of Sacramento, Neil Schneider, Rick Braziel, Khang, be granted and that all cl aims against defendants be dismissed with prejudice and that Motion to Strike be denied. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of Court be directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants, close this case, and vacate all future dates in this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/2011 ORDERING that, in light of defendants motion to dismiss 18 that is under submission with the Court, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 26 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may re-file the motion for summary judgment or re-notice the motion for summary judgment for a hearing after the Court has resolved defendants motion to dismiss. (Caspar, M)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/16/2010 GRANTING 5 Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order within which to file and serve an amended complaint entitled "Third Amended Complaint." (Reader, L)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/2010 DISCHARGING 7 Order to Show Cause. Defendant's 5 Motions to Dismiss and Strike Complaint will remain on calendar for 9/16/2010. Plaintiff shall file a written Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to pending Motions on or before 9/2/2010. Defendant may Reply to plaintiffs' Opposition on or before 9/9/2010. (Marciel, M)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/04/10 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing not later than 08/19/10 why sanctions including dismisal should not be imposed for failure to prosecute and failure to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to 5 motion to dismiss. A written statement of opposition or non-opposition due by 09/02/10. Motion Hearing re-set for 9/16/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Low v. City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte L. Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Marcos Alfonso Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?