Willis v. Cassey et al
Plaintiff: Marcell Willis
Defendant: Cassey, Hayward, - Tennison, Dunlap, D. Johnston, Curry, Douchow, Vasquez, Bickford, Barker, Quante, Hasworth, Prunity, Lee, Diane O'Loughlin and Pete
Case Number: 2:2010cv01631
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/04/14 recommending that defendants' motion for summary judgment 67 be granted, judgment be entered for defendants and this case be closed. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 67 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/16/13 GRANTING 66 Motion to file Plaintiff Marcell Willis medical records under seal. The Court will review the information in camera in relation to the motion for summary judgment and the records will be returned to Defendants counsel at the close of this action.(Dillon, M)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/14/13 granting 62 Motion for leave to bring a summary judgment, and defendant have until 04/15/13 to file their summary judgment motion. There will be no extension of time absent extraordinar y circumstances. Following service of the summary judgment motion, plaintiff will have 30 days to respond, after which defendants will have 7 days to file a reply. The dates previously set for the trial confirmation hearing 05/16/13 and for the jur y trial 09/16/13 are hereby vacated, to be re-set, if appropriate, upon adjudication of defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants must show cause within 14 days why monetary sanctions should not be imposed for the inordinate tardiness of the motion 62 . (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER adopting 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/12: Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies is granted in part and denied in part 46 .This matter will proceed to trial as to the remaining defendants. (Kaminski, H)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/20/12 defendant's counsel's response regarding the 07/11/12 order to show cause indicates the omission was entirely inadvertent and counsel has now filed a belated answer on defendant Johnson's behalf. The court will excuse defendant's tardiness on this representation, find defendant Johnston not to be in default and deem the show cause order discharged. (Plummer, M)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/10/12 ORDERING that defendant Johnston show cause wihtin 14 days why he should not be found to be in default for failing to respond timely to the amended compl aint. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, filed on 02/27/12 46 be granted in part and denied in part as follows: granted as to defendants O'Laughlin and Casey; and denied as to defendants Lee, Vasquez, Hayward, Dochow, Curry and Damiano; and this matter proceed to trial as to the remaining defendants. MOTION to DISMISS 46 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/11/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff is provided 21 days to file additional evidentiary submissions if he wishes, but it is not required. There will be no extensions of time.(Yin, K)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/1/11 DENYING 15 motion to appoint counsel, DENYING 38 Motion regarding the taking of his deposition.(Dillon, M)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting in full 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/22/11. Defendants Prunity, Haworth, Dunlap, Quarte, Tennison, Bickford and Barker are DISMISSED, and any claim of conspiracy against defendants Johnston and Hayward is dismissed as well.(Kastilahn, A)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/11/2011 DENYING pltf's 15 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/15/10 ORDERING service is appropriate for defendants Curry, Douchow, Vasquez, Johnston, Casey, Lee, Pete, O'Laughlin and Hayward. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff 9 USM-285 forms, 1 summons, instruction sheet and a copy of the 09/02/10 amended complaint to be completed and returned within 28 days. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants Prunity, Haworth, Dunlap, Quarte, Tennison, Bickford, Barker, and any claim of conspiracy against defendants Johnston and Hayward be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/8/2010 ORDERING Plaintiff's claims against defendants Prunity; Haworth; Dunlap, Quarte, Tennison; Bickford; Barker are dismissed, as is any claim of conspiracy against defendants Johnston and Hayward, for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file a second amended complaint w/in 28 days from the date of service of this Order. Failure to file a second amended complaint will result in a recommendation that these defendants/claims be dismissed from this action. Upon filing a second amended complaint or expiration of the time allowed therefor, the court will make further orders for service of process upon some or all of the defendants.(Matson, R)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/17/10 ORDERING that the Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation collect and forward payment from the prisoner trust account of Marcell Willis until the balance of $350 is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis affidavit on Director, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Cassey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcell Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Tennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prunity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane O'Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?