Brady v. Marsh et al
Plaintiff: Josh Brady
Defendant: Marsh, Gary R. Stanton, Cullison and Cameron
Case Number: 2:2010cv01658
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/11 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations.(Duong, D)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/28/11 ORDERING that plf's 12 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days leave to file a second amended complaint. Clerk to send civil rights form. (Benson, A.)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Josh Brady signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/22/2010. The Sheriff of Solano County is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $23.00 and thereafter the $ ;327.00 balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Sheriff of Solano County. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order.(cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR]ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Josh Brady signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/22/10. CDC is to collect monthly payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk unt il the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M) Modified on 9/22/2010 (Plummer, M).
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/6/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Marsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?