Scott v. Sanches et al
Plaintiff: Howard Scott
Defendant: Sanches, Kalso, CDCR and M. McDonald
Case Number: 2:2010cv01664
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/11 VACATING 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Dillon, M)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/29/11 DENYING 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/10 ORDERING that the September 22, 2010 15 findings and recommendations (Dkt. No. 15) are VACATED. The 17 second amended complaint is DISMISSED. Within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Amendment and submit the following documents to the court: the completed Notice of Amendment and an original and one copy of the Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's third amended complaint shall comply with the requirements of the Civil Rights Act, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. The third amended complaint must also bear the docket number assigned to this case and must be labeled Third Amended Complaint. Failure to file a third amended complaint in accordance with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. (Duong, D)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/21/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/12/10 ORDERING that the Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation collect and forward payment from the prisoner trust account of Howard S cott until the balance of $350 is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit on Director, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/20/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Sanches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?