USA v. Approximately $16,540.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $16,540.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2010cv01713
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/26/11 ORDERING that the 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted; Michael Devon Johnson, Brandon Marcus Bivens, Terrance Spencer Brown, and Natasha Billeci are held in DEFAULT; a judgment by default is hereby ENTERED against any right, title, or interest of Michael Devon Johnson, Brandon Marcus Bivens, Terrance Spencer Brown, and Natasha Billeci in the defendant currency; a final judgment of forfeiture is hereby ENTERED forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant currency to the U.S., to be disposed of according to law. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Benson, A.)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2011 RECOMMENDING that Michael Devon Johnson, Natasha Billeci, Terrance Spencer Brown, and Brandon Marcus Bivens be held in default; pltf's 15 motion for default jud gment and final judgment of forfeiture be granted; a judgment by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Michael Devon Johnson, Natasha Billeci, Terrance Spencer Brown, and Brandon Marcus Bivens in the dft currency; a final judgment be entered. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Zignago, K.)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/8/10 ORDERING that the Clerk shall issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency. (Owen, K)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/7/10 GRANTING the AUSA, publication of this action and arrest, for general circulation, as designated by this Court. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $16,540.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S. Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $16,540.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?