Lum v. County of San Joaquin, et al.,
Plaintiff: Jerry Lum and Dorothea Timmons
Defendant: County of San Joaquin, City of Lathrop, Walters and Steve Pease
Case Number: 2:2010cv01807
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/10/2016 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LATHROP signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/15. The City of Lathrop (the City) is DISMISED with prejudice. Each Plaintiff and the City shall bear its respective fees and costs. The case remains open against the other named Defendants. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FIRST AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/15/14: The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 10/15/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER 126 for CONSENT granting Substitution of Attorney signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/22/2014. Herum\Crabtree\Suntag is ordered substituted in as counsel of record for Sergeant Ray Walters in place of The Suntag Law Firm. (Marciel, M)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/7/2012 ORDERING 114 Defendants' motion to stay is GRANTED in its entirety. The entire matter is STAYED pending resolution of defendants' appeal. All dates previously set in this case are VACATED. (Reader, L)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION and ORDER 111 to re-schedule hearing signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/30/2012. Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 6/25/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). (Marciel, M)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/22/2012 GRANTING in part, DENYING in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/1/2012 ORDERING each party to submit additional breifing re 71 Motion for Summary Judgment within 21 days. (Michel, G)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/20/12 ORDERING the parties are free to stipulate among themselves concerning the timing of depositions. However, the court will not enforce any such agreements. The motion to extend the discovery deadline is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/04/12 ORDERING that the unredacted 10/01/09 letter to the file by Sgt. Balsalto shall be produced to plaintiffs' counsel within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding detainee information signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/21/11. (Matson, R)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/14/11 ORDERING that each side may conduct up to 20 depositions. (Benson, A.)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/18/11. (Meuleman, A)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/31/2011 CONTINUING Expert Disclosure/Report Deadling until 11/30/2011; CONTINUING Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline until 12/31/2011; CONTINUING Discovery Cut-Off until 1/31/2012. The Law & Motion Deadline and the Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates remain the same. (Michel, G)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/17/10. (Kaminski, H)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 0/28/10: Discovery due by 12/31/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/29/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 8/28/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/17/2010 DENYING without prejudice 10 Motion to Dismiss; The hearing on this motion set for 9/27/2010 is vacated. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lum v. County of San Joaquin, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lum
Represented By: Walter H. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Joaquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?